Hafner v. Lujan Grisham et al
Plaintiff: Eric Hafner
Defendant: Governor of NM Michelle Lujan Grisham, Raul Torrez and Mag Toulose Oliver
Case Number: 1:2023cv01151
Filed: December 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Margaret I Strickland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2024 Filing 6 Letter by Eric Hafner (jjs)
January 17, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE Declaration of Candidacy by Eric Hafner (jn)
January 16, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION For Expedited Hearing and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eric Hafner. (jn)
January 16, 2024 Filing 3 Letter by Eric Hafner (jn)
December 26, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Hafner. (gr)
December 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eric Hafner. (gr)
December 26, 2023 United States District Judge Margaret I. Strickland and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hafner v. Lujan Grisham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hafner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor of NM Michelle Lujan Grisham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Torrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mag Toulose Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?