Wilson v. The Phoenix Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brian Wilson
Defendant: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv00025
Filed: January 9, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Kea W Riggs
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2024 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Phoenix Insurance Company Regarding The Phoenix Insurance Companys First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff Brian Wilson (Noya, Jennifer)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Settlement Conference set for 6/13/2024 at 09:00 AM Remote via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
February 16, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE by Brian Wilson of Service (Solomon, Neil)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Case Management Deadlines and Discovery Parameters by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2024. Discovery due by 9/3/2024. Motions due by 10/3/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/2/2024. (lj)
February 15, 2024 Filing 13 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing: Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 2/15/2024. (lj)
February 15, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Phoenix Insurance Company Defendant The Phoenix Insurance Companys Initial Disclosures (Noya, Jennifer)
February 6, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
February 5, 2024 Filing 10 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by The Phoenix Insurance Company (Noya, Jennifer)
February 2, 2024 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 30, 2024 Filing 8 Transmittal of State Court Documents by The Phoenix Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Noya, Jennifer)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2024 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 2/8/2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/1/2024. (lj)
January 10, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Solomon on behalf of Brian Wilson (Solomon, Neil)
January 9, 2024 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 9, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Phoenix Insurance Company (Noya, Jennifer)
January 9, 2024 Filing 2 The Phoenix Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) to Complaint by The Phoenix Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Noya, Jennifer)
January 9, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Phoenix Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2023-07574. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Noya, Jennifer)
January 9, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9161964 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Noya, Jennifer)
January 9, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. The Phoenix Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Wilson
Represented By: Neil Solomon
Represented By: Shivangi Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer A. Noya
Represented By: Shannon N. Nairn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?