Illinois National Insurance Company v. Easley et al
Plaintiff: Illinois National Insurance Company
Defendant: Daniel Easley, Donovan Gonnie, Francisco Sarmiento Rodriguez, Juan Hernandez Saucedo and Matthew McAllister
Case Number: 1:2024cv00061
Filed: January 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jennifer M Rozzoni
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Daniel Easley by Illinois National Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Lipman, Matthew)
February 26, 2024 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Francisco Sarmiento Rodriguez, Juan Hernandez Saucedo (jg)
February 23, 2024 Filing 10 PRAECIPE/Request for Entry of Default against Defendants, Francisco Sarmiento Rodriguez and Juan Hernandez Saucedo by Illinois National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew A. Lipman, Esq.) (Lipman, Matthew) Modified on 2/26/2024 (jg).
February 8, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Illinois National Insurance Company. Juan Hernandez Saucedo served on 2/1/2024, answer due 2/22/2024. (Lipman, Matthew)
February 8, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Illinois National Insurance Company. Francisco Sarmiento Rodriguez served on 2/1/2024, answer due 2/22/2024. (Lipman, Matthew)
February 8, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Illinois National Insurance Company. Daniel Easley served on 2/5/2024, answer due 2/26/2024. (Lipman, Matthew)
February 7, 2024 Filing 6 "FILED IN ERROR" AFFIDAVIT of Service by Illinois National Insurance Company (Lipman, Matthew) Modified text on 2/8/2024 (eh).
February 7, 2024 Filing 5 "FILED IN ERROR" AFFIDAVIT of Service by Illinois National Insurance Company (Lipman, Matthew) Modified text on 2/8/2024 (eh).
February 7, 2024 Filing 4 "FILED IN ERROR" AFFIDAVIT of Service by Illinois National Insurance Company (Lipman, Matthew) Modified text on 2/8/2024 (eh).
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Non-Service by Illinois National Insurance Company (Lipman, Matthew)
January 23, 2024 Summons Issued as to Daniel Easley, Donovan Gonnie, Matthew McAllister, Francisco Sarmiento Rodriguez and Juan Hernandez Saucedo. (eh)
January 18, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
January 18, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni assigned. (bc)
January 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Easley, Donovan Gonnie, Matthew McAllister, Francisco Sarmiento Rodriguez, Juan Hernandez Saucedo ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Illinois National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lipman, Matthew)
January 17, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9175229 re #1 Complaint, filed by Illinois National Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lipman, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illinois National Insurance Company v. Easley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois National Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew A. Lipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donovan Gonnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Sarmiento Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Hernandez Saucedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?