Pacifica Rosemont LLC et al v. Buffer
Plaintiff: Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Senior Living LLC, Pacifica Senior Management LLC and Pacifica Companies LLC
Defendant: Laurie Buffer
Case Number: 1:2024cv00093
Filed: January 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Damian L Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing on #3 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Arbitration: Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2024 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque (courtroom to be determined) before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
March 21, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Pacifica Companies LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Senior Living LLC, Pacifica Senior Management LLC re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Pacifica Senior Living LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Companies LLC, Pacifica Senior Management LLC (Garcia, Tomas)
March 21, 2024 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Pacifica Companies LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Senior Living LLC, Pacifica Senior Management LLC. (Garcia, Tomas)
March 13, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 11. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
March 11, 2024 Filing 15 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
March 8, 2024 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Laurie Buffer. (Pitman, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Laurie Buffer. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Pacifica Senior Living LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Companies LLC, Pacifica Senior Management LLC.(Pitman, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b)(2), the Court FINDS good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time pending resolution of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Arbitration (Doc. 3). [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kmt)
February 28, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2) and considering the pending motion, the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (dkf)
February 27, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Pitman on behalf of Laurie Buffer (Pitman, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by Laurie Buffer Stipulated Notice of Extension of Time to Answer (Pitman, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pacifica Senior Management LLC (Garcia, Tomas)
February 15, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pacifica Companies LLC (Garcia, Tomas)
February 15, 2024 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pacifica Rosemont LLC (Garcia, Tomas)
February 15, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pacifica Senior Living LLC (Garcia, Tomas)
January 31, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Pacifica Companies LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Senior Living LLC, Pacifica Senior Management LLC. (Hernandez, Michelle)
January 30, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9194661 re #1 Complaint, filed by Pacifica Senior Living LLC, Pacifica Rosemont LLC, Pacifica Companies LLC, Pacifica Senior Management LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hernandez, Michelle)
January 29, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
January 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Compel Arbitration against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Pacifica Rosemont, LLC, Pacifica Companies, LLC, Pacifica Senior Management, LLC, Pacifica Senior Living, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hernandez, Michelle)
January 29, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacifica Rosemont LLC et al v. Buffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacifica Rosemont LLC
Represented By: Margaret M Hickey
Represented By: Tomas J Garcia
Represented By: Michelle A Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacifica Senior Living LLC
Represented By: Margaret M Hickey
Represented By: Tomas J Garcia
Represented By: Michelle A Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacifica Senior Management LLC
Represented By: Margaret M Hickey
Represented By: Tomas J Garcia
Represented By: Michelle A Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacifica Companies LLC
Represented By: Margaret M Hickey
Represented By: Michelle A Hernandez
Represented By: Tomas J Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Buffer
Represented By: Jeffrey Pitman
Represented By: Benjamin Eduardo Reyes
Represented By: Katherine Metzger
Represented By: Slate Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?