Inman et al v. Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: Shasta Inman and Martha Llamas
Defendant: Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools and Danny Aldaz
Case Number: 1:2024cv00147
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Matthew L Garcia
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2024 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools 1st Set of Discovery to Plaintiff (Garcia, Tomas)
April 8, 2024 Filing 17 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools (Garcia, Tomas)
April 3, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shasta Inman, Martha Llamas Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (Sedillo, Carlos)
April 3, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools for APS' Initial Disclosures (Garcia, Tomas)
April 3, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Danny Aldaz Certificate of Service for Defendant Aldaz Initial Disclosures (Rawls-De Santiago, Roxie)
April 1, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shasta Inman, Martha Llamas Plaintiff's First Discovery Instrument to Defendant Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools (Sedillo, Carlos)
March 5, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac James Lopez on behalf of Shasta Inman, Martha Llamas (Lopez, Isaac)
March 1, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Danny Aldaz. (Rawls-De Santiago, Roxie)
February 26, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 7 and 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
February 20, 2024 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Matthew L. Garcia as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2024. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2024 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/8/2024. (kc)
February 13, 2024 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
February 13, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (bc)
February 12, 2024 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools sending USDC filed documents to counsel of record (Garcia, Tomas)
February 12, 2024 Filing 3 APS' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools. (Garcia, Tomas)
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tomas J Garcia on behalf of Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools (Garcia, Tomas)
February 12, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Second Judicial, case number D-202-cv-2023-09612. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garcia, Tomas)
February 12, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9217565 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Danny Aldaz, Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Garcia, Tomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inman et al v. Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shasta Inman
Represented By: Carlos E Sedillo
Represented By: Isaac James Lopez
Represented By: Matthew J Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Llamas
Represented By: Carlos E Sedillo
Represented By: Isaac James Lopez
Represented By: Matthew J Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools
Represented By: Tomas J Garcia
Represented By: Jennifer G. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Aldaz
Represented By: Roxie P Rawls-De Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?