Young v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Young
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America, Inc., LHM SWH, LLC and LHM SWH, LLC doing business as LHM Southwest Hyundai Albuquerque
Case Number: 1:2024cv00164
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Margaret I Strickland
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Discovery closes September 16, 2024. Discovery motions are due by September 23, 2024. Pretrial motions are due by October 28, 2024. (ama)
April 12, 2024 Filing 20 CLERK'S MINUTES for telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter on April 12, 2024. Cassie Fleming appeared for Plaintiff and Amanda Heitz appeared for Defendant Hyundai. Tara Young attended for Defendant LHM, with whom Plaintiff has settled and documents to that effect are forthcoming. The parties reported no issues with initial disclosures. The Court informed the parties of its discovery dispute procedure of an informal telephonic conference prior to filing motions. The parties discussed a discovery plan which will issue in a separate Scheduling Order. The parties wish to set a remote settlement conference in early May. Chambers will contact the parties to secure a firm date. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ama)
April 10, 2024 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hyundai Motor America, Inc. of Hyundai Motor America's First Supplemental Disclosure Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) (Heitz, Amanda)
April 5, 2024 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hyundai Motor America, Inc. of Its Initial Disclosure Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) (Heitz, Amanda)
April 5, 2024 Filing 17 Joint Status Report by Kathryn Young (Fleming, Cassie)
April 5, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement by LHM SWH, LLC (Young, Tara)
April 5, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara M Young on behalf of LHM SWH, LLC (Young, Tara)
April 3, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kathryn Young Initial disclosures (Fleming, Cassie)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter SETTING a telephonic Rule 16(c) Scheduling Conference for Friday, April 12, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. Mountain Time. Counsel shall call Judge Ritter's AT&T conference line to connect to the hearing: 888-278-0296 (access code: 9998216#). JSR and initial disclosures are due by April 5, 2024. (ama)
March 11, 2024 Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to United States District Judge Margaret I. Strickland as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
March 5, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 3/11/2024 unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cda)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 1, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement with LHM SWH, LLC by Kathryn Young (Fleming, Cassie)
February 27, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cda)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 23, 2024 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Motor America, Inc. (Heitz, Amanda)
February 23, 2024 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hyundai Motor America, Inc. (Heitz, Amanda)
February 23, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Heitz, Amanda)
February 20, 2024 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number ANMDC-9228495 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LHM SWH, LLC from Second Judicial District Court Bernalillo County, case number D-202-CV-2024-04422. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by LHM SWH, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Supplement 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Chappell, Joshua) filed by LHM SWH, LLC (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 20, 2024 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
February 20, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (eh)
February 16, 2024 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by LHM SWH, LLC. (Chappell, Joshua)
February 16, 2024 Filing 2 First MOTION to Compel LHM SWH, LLC Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Complaint by LHM SWH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Chappell, Joshua)
February 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LHM SWH, LLC from Second Judicial District Court Bernalillo County, case number D-202-CV-2024-04422. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by LHM SWH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Chappell, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Young
Represented By: Cassie Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda E Heitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LHM SWH, LLC
Represented By: Joshua T. Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LHM SWH, LLC doing business as LHM Southwest Hyundai Albuquerque
Represented By: Tara M Young
Represented By: Joshua T. Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?