Continental Divide Electric Cooperative, Inc. v. Davey Resource Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Continental Divide Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Defendant: Davey Resource Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00281
Filed: March 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Matthew L Garcia
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE by Continental Divide Electric Cooperative, Inc. of Withdrawal of Attorney (Duhigg, Katy)
May 7, 2024 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Davey Resource Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Davey Tree Expert Company for Davey Resource Group, Inc., Davey Resource Group, Inc.. (Johnson, Eric)
May 6, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE by Davey Resource Group, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement (Johnson, Eric)
May 6, 2024 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Continental Divide Electric Cooperative, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Johnson, Kara)
May 3, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE by Davey Resource Group, Inc. re 16 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Notice of Certificate of Good Standing for Lucy Dollens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Certificate of Good Standing for Lucy Dollens) (Johnson, Eric)
May 2, 2024 Filing 16 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Counter Claimant Davey Resource Group, Inc., Defendant Davey Resource Group, Inc. by Eric Bowen Johnson on behalf of: Lucy Dollens Quarles & Brady LLP 135 N. Pennsylvania St., Suite 2400Indianapolis, IN 46204 317-399-2815 Fax 317-957-5015 Lucy.Dollens@quarles.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Johnson, Eric)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephone Status Conference set for 8/8/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Settlement Conference set for 1/10/2025 at 09:00 AM via ZOOM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The Court will provide instructions and a ZOOM invitation in the days preceding the settlement conference. Telephone Pre-Settlement Status Conference set for 1/7/2025 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. See Order for additional instructions and deadlines. (kc)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Discovery due by 12/30/2024; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 8/30/2024; Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 09/27/2024; Discovery Motions due by 01/21/2025; Pretrial Motions due by 1/31/2025. (kc)
May 2, 2024 Filing 12 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 5/2/2024. (kc)
May 2, 2024 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9340491 re: # 16 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Davey Resource Group, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Johnson, Eric)
April 29, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, by Continental Divide Electric Cooperative, Inc..(Mostoller, Lynn)
April 24, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
April 23, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE by Continental Divide Electric Cooperative, Inc. of Agreed Upon Extension (Mostoller, Lynn)
April 22, 2024 Filing 8 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Davey Resource Group, Inc. (Johnson, Eric)
April 15, 2024 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Matthew L. Garcia as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 8, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 4 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (lj)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 28, 2024 Filing 4 Defendant Davey Resource Group, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Continental Divide Electric Cooperative, Inc. by Davey Resource Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to DRG Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim) (Johnson, Eric)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 4/22/2024. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2024 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/12/2024. (kc)
March 21, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
March 21, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Davey Resource Group, Inc. from Cibola County Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1333-CV-2024-00039. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Davey Resource Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Eric)
March 21, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9276446 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Davey Resource Group, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Johnson, Eric)
March 21, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Divide Electric Cooperative, Inc. v. Davey Resource Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Divide Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Kara Jenelle Johnson
Represented By: Lynn E Mostoller
Represented By: Katy Duhigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davey Resource Group, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Bowen Johnson
Represented By: Lucy Dollens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?