DACA Design LLC v. Hangtime LLC et al
Counter Defendant: DACA Design LLC
Counter Claimant: Hangtime LLC and Harbhajan S Khalsa
Case Number: 1:2024cv00319
Filed: April 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Matthew L Garcia
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 Filing 19 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to United States District Judge Matthew L. Garcia as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
May 23, 2024 Filing 18 STIPULATION on Extension of Time For Responsive Pleading to Counterclaims by DACA Design LLC (Walkow, Marc)
May 15, 2024 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DACA Design LLC (Walkow, Marc)
May 8, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 05/29/2024 unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 07/09/2024 at 10:30 AM. Joint Status Report due by 06/28/2024. (cm)
May 8, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard H Krukar on behalf of Hangtime LLC, Harbhajan S Khalsa (Krukar, Richard)
May 7, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lena Bacani on behalf of Hangtime LLC, Harbhajan S Khalsa (Bacani, Lena)
May 7, 2024 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hangtime LLC (Bacani, Lena)
May 7, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against DACA Design LLC by Harbhajan S Khalsa, Hangtime LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by DACA Design LLC.(Bacani, Lena)
April 26, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DACA Design LLC. Harbhajan S Khalsa served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. (Garcia, Monica)
April 26, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DACA Design LLC. Hangtime LLC served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. (Garcia, Monica)
April 8, 2024 Filing 8 Report re: patent (bc)
April 5, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R Garcia on behalf of DACA Design LLC (Garcia, Monica)
April 5, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R Garcia on behalf of DACA Design LLC (Garcia, Monica)
April 5, 2024 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff DACA Design LLC by Monica R Garcia on behalf of: Marc D Walkow Greenspoon Marder LLP 1345 Avenue of the Americas, Suite 2200New York, New York 10105 212-524-5006 marc.walkow@gmlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Garcia, Monica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 5, 2024 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff DACA Design LLC by Monica R Garcia on behalf of: Robert J. Rando Greenspoon Marder LLP 1345 Avenue of the Americas, Suite 2200New York, New York 10105 212-524-5006 robert.rando@gmlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Garcia, Monica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 5, 2024 Summons Issued as to Hangtime LLC, Harbhajan S Khalsa. (bc)
April 5, 2024 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9298110 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by DACA Design LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Garcia, Monica)
April 5, 2024 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9298099 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by DACA Design LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Garcia, Monica)
April 3, 2024 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
April 3, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
April 3, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (bc)
April 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by DACA Design LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garcia, Monica)
April 2, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9293020 re #1 Complaint filed by DACA Design LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Garcia, Monica)
April 2, 2024 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 6 (Santa Fe) to 1 (Albuquerque). (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DACA Design LLC v. Hangtime LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: DACA Design LLC
Represented By: Monica R Garcia
Represented By: Marc Walkow
Represented By: Robert J. Rando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Hangtime LLC
Represented By: Lena Bacani
Represented By: Richard H Krukar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Harbhajan S Khalsa
Represented By: Lena Bacani
Represented By: Richard H Krukar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?