Khan v. Barela et al
Plaintiff: Erik Khan
Defendant: Chris Barela, Elva Bright, Gordon Devereaux, Bill Stickles, FNU Beam, Justin Porter, Vicki Hooser, Cheryl Roach, Jason Duran, Tammy Rush and Dona Ana County
Case Number: 2:2015cv01151
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Dona Ana
Presiding Judge: Martha Vazquez
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING IN PART 128 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Directing Preparation of Martinez Report. Defendants' Martinez Report is due by September 7, 2021. Plaintiff's response is due by October 21, 2021. Defendants' reply is due by November 8, 2021. (rcf)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING 142 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (rcf)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER ADOPTING 136 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by District Judge Martha Vazquez; DENYING 123 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Aramark Corporation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Aramark's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 123 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Aramark file a responsive pleading within 14 days of the issuance of this Order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(4)(A). (gr)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to DENY 123 Defendant Aramark's Motion to Dismiss. Objections to PF&RD due by January 26, 2021. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (rcf)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez GRANTING 130 MOTION to Dismiss Party. David Beam and Bill Stickles terminated. See order for specifics. (gr)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to DENY 112 Defendants Beam and Stickles's Motion to Dismiss. Objections to PF&RD due by October 22, 2020. Add 3 days to the deadline i f service is by mail to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D), (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c). (rcf)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 117 Plaintiff's Motion for Personal Service on Defendant Aramark and DIRECTING the Clerk to Re-Issue Notice and Waiver-of-Service Form as to Defendant Aramark. (am)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 96 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, AMENDING the Caption, and DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to DOCKET the Third Amended Complaint and to ISSUE Notice and Waiver-of-Service Forms. (am)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez DENYING 82 MOTION for Order; and DISMISSING 70 Amended Complaint. See Order for Specifics. (gr)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING as premature 77 Plaintiff Erik Khan's Motion for Order to Issue Summons and Memorandum of Law in Support. (sg)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING as moot 71 , 72 , 73 , and 74 Plaintiff's motions to stay case and also to lift stay of case. (am)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Barela et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Barela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elva Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Devereaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Stickles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Hooser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dona Ana County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?