Aguilar et al v. Management & Training Corporation
Plaintiff: Marisela Aguilar, Miguel Blanco, Francisco J Carranza, Juan Coronel, Eric Enriquez, Rafael Gallegos, Robert Gallegos, Benjamin Guerrero, Ivan Eloy Gurrola, Vaughn D Hayes, Enrique Hernandez, Jose R Hernandez, Rogelio Hernandez, Roman Jauregui, Efren Jimenez, Flavio Lara, Noemi R Mendoza, Sixto Navarette, Anthony Guadalupe Ordaz, Victor Ortiz, Armando Pacheco, Alan Perez, Luis E Rubio, Rigoberto Rodarte, Antonio Vasquez and Adrian Villalobos
Defendant: Management & Training Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv00050
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Otero
Presiding Judge: William P. Johnson
Presiding Judge: Gregory B. Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING 160 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability (First Amended Complaint) and DENYING 208 Opposed Motion to Supplement Record with New MTC Timekeeping Policy. (mag)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson DENYING 152 Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to Designate Detention Officers Assigned to Transport Duty as a Subgroup. (mag)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson DENYING 150 Plaintiffs Opposed Motion Seeking Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (mag)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt granting in part and denying in part 106 Motion for Protective Order and 113 Motion to Compel. (kdj)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson ADOPTING the Magistrate Judges 101 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition. (mag)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION re 55 Motion for Conditional Certification by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2017. (kdj)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 86 Motion to Dismiss J. Coronel, E. Enriquez, R. Gallegos. (mag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar et al v. Management & Training Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management & Training Corporation
Represented By: Krystle A Thomas
Represented By: Aaron C. Viets
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisela Aguilar
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Blanco
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco J Carranza
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Coronel
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Enriquez
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Gallegos
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gallegos
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Guerrero
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Eloy Gurrola
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn D Hayes
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Hernandez
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose R Hernandez
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Hernandez
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Jauregui
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efren Jimenez
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flavio Lara
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noemi R Mendoza
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sixto Navarette
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Guadalupe Ordaz
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Ortiz
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Pacheco
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Perez
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis E Rubio
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigoberto Rodarte
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Vasquez
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Villalobos
Represented By: Robert Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?