Varela et al v. Nova Hardbanding, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Varela and Evan Reed
Defendant: Nova Hardbanding, LLC and Kenneth Bromley
Case Number: 2:2016cv00129
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Lea
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Setting Hearing on 78 Joint Motion to File Under Seal by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for 6/27/2017 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] (atc)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER to Submit Closing Documents by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varela et al v. Nova Hardbanding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Varela
Represented By: George Z. Goldberg
Represented By: James M. Loren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Reed
Represented By: George Z. Goldberg
Represented By: James M. Loren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Hardbanding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Bromley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?