Yazzie v. Fezatte et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Yazzie
Defendant: Seth Fezatte and Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00472
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: McKinley
Presiding Judge: Gregory J. Fouratt
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea denying 173 Motion for Protective Order. (atc)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea RESETTING Settlement Conference for May 18, 2021 at 09:00 AM via Zoom. The Court will send out invitations for the Zoom proceedings approximately one week before the settlement conference. Telephonic Status Conference set for April 14, 2021 at 09:00 AM. Consult Order for associated deadlines. (atc)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for February 25, 2021 at 09:00 AM via Zoom. Telephonic Status Conference set for January 28, 2021 at 11:00 AM. Consult Order for associated deadlines. (atc)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker granting 154 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC.'S PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIM and denying 157 MOTION for Summary Judgment SETH FEZATTE'S PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIM. (bap)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker granting and denying in part 139 MOTION to Stay All Civil Proceedings Pending Adjudication of Felony Criminal Charges Against Seth Fezatte as further described herein. (bap)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker granting in part to allow additional briefing on the punitive damages claim re 108 Motion for Reconsideration re 102 Memorandum Opinion and Order (bap)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James A. Parker GRANTING in part 68 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Shawn Wayne Miller's Purported "Expert" Opinions as described herein. Daubert Hearing set for 3/20/2018 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, 6th Floor Courtroom before District Judge James A. Parker. (kg)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker granting and denying re 69 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment as further described herein. (bap)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 50 Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. (atc)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 47 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yazzie v. Fezatte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Fezatte
Represented By: Valerie R Auger
Represented By: Eric Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Valerie R Auger
Represented By: Eric Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Yazzie
Represented By: Joseph G Isaac
Represented By: William R Keeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?