Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company v. Gallegos, Sr.
Plaintiff: Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company
Defendant: Manuel Gallegos
Case Number: 2:2016cv00540
Filed: June 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: -OUT OF STATE-
Presiding Judge: Gregory J. Fouratt
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Amended Pleadings due by 5/19/2017. Discovery due by 9/22/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 5/19/2017. Pretrial Motions due by 11/3/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by 2/5/2018. (atc)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 3/13/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. (atc)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Show Cause Response due by 3/6/2017. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company v. Gallegos, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argonaut-Midwest Insurance Company
Represented By: Sonya R. Burke
Represented By: Jennifer A. Noya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?