Calvillo v. Lewis Casing Crews, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Calvillo
Defendant: Lewis Casing Crews, Inc. and Patrick Lewis
Case Number: 2:2016cv00921
Filed: August 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Lea
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER to File Closing Documents by 10/5/17 by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 41 Joint Motion to Extend Mediation by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Adopting Joint Case Management Plan by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The Joint Status Report is due by 6/15/2017. A Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing is set for 6/22/2017 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calvillo v. Lewis Casing Crews, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Calvillo
Represented By: J. Derek Braziel
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Represented By: Jack L. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Casing Crews, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?