Inge et al v. McClelland
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Inge and Johnny Inge
Defendant: Robert (Bob) McClelland
Case Number: 2:2016cv01232
Filed: November 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Curry
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Senior District Judge James A. Parker. (bap)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2017. Discovery due by 8/1/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 4/3/2017. Pretrial Motions due by 9/12/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by 12/15/2017. (atc)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2017 at 02:30 PM in Las Cruces before Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 1/30/2017. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inge et al v. McClelland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Inge
Represented By: Eric D Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Inge
Represented By: Eric D Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert (Bob) McClelland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?