Aswad v. Burwell
Plaintiff: Mohamed Basel Aswad
Defendant: Sylvia M. Burwell
Case Number: 2:2016cv01367
Filed: December 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Luna
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Presiding Judge: Gregory B. Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff by Circuit Judge Bobby R Baldock. (cs)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff's Show-Cause Response is due by August 14, 2017. (sg)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING Briefing Schedule. Motion to Remand is due by June 27, 2017. Response is due by August 22, 2017. Reply is due by September 19, 2017. (am)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Seal Administrative Record (am)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's responsive pleading is due no later than April 5, 2017. (am)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aswad v. Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Basel Aswad
Represented By: Mary (Molly) E Schmidt-Nowara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia M. Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?