Poel v. State of New Mexico
Plaintiff: Martin H. Poel
Defendant: State of New Mexico
Case Number: 2:2017cv00185
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Dona Ana
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J. Gonzales
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 16 Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss; denying 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Oral Argument; and denying 28 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/18/2018 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - 420 Mimbres Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Plaintiff is required to appear in person; Defendant may appear at its discretion. (tah)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 9/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 17 Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of State of New Mexico's Motion to Dismiss. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poel v. State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin H. Poel
Represented By: Martin H Poel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Ari Biernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?