Salazar v. AutoZone Stores LLC
Plaintiff: Ursula Salazar
Defendant: Autozone Stores LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00236
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Lea
Presiding Judge: M. Christina Armijo
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting in part 21 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 23 Motion to Withdraw by Plaintiff's counsel. (cbf)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2017. Discovery due by 8/22/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 5/24/2017. Pretrial Motions due by 10/3/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by 1/5/2018. (atc)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 3/13/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2017 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/21/2017. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar v. AutoZone Stores LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Salazar
Represented By: Dick A Blenden
Represented By: Max Houston Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone Stores LLC
Represented By: Christina G. Nason
Represented By: Simon D. Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?