Garcia v. The Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Samuel Garcia
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv00423
Filed: April 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Lea
Referring Judge: Kevin R. Sweazea
Presiding Judge: Gregory B. Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 AMENDED ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for July 12, 2018 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 480 Picacho Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Plaintiff's letter due to Defendant: June 19, 2018; Defendant's letter due to Plaintiff: June 28, 2018; confidential position papers due to the Court: July 5, 2018. (sls)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for June 26, 2018 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 480 Picacho Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Plaintiff's letter due to Defendant: June 4, 2018; Defendant's letter due to Plaintiff: June 12, 2018; Confidential position papers (and any audio/video recordings) due to Court: June 19, 2018. (sls)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 36 Motion to Amend/Correct. Discovery shall terminate on April 27, 2018. The deadline for motions relating to discovery shall be May 4, 2018. The deadline for all other motions shall be May 29, 2018. Plaintiff shall provide a pre-trial order to Defendant by July 16, 2018. Defendant shall provide the pre-trial order to the Court by July 23, 2018. (sls)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 32 Motion to Extend. Defendant's retained expert disclosure deadline shall be January 12, 2018. (sls)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 29 ORDER on Motion to Extend. (sls)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Discovery due by 3/13/2018. Motions related to discovery due by 3/27/2018. All Other Motions due by 4/13/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due to Court by 6/8/2018. (cbf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. The Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: P. Scott Eaton
Represented By: Amy Samberg
Represented By: Jeri Wettestad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Garcia
Represented By: Jonathan Baeza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?