Rodriguez v. Adams Radio Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brenda Rodriguez
Defendant: Adams Radio Group, LLC and Adams Radio Group of Las Cruces, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00791
Filed: August 2, 2017
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Dona Ana
Presiding Judge: Gregory J. Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kevin R. Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2018 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 44 by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Motion Hearing set for August 30, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces - 480 Picacho Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (sls)
May 23, 2018 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 40 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The deadline for motions relating to discovery shall be July 9, 2018. The deadline for all other motions shall be July 23, 2018. (sls)
May 14, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating the May 15, 2018, settlement conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
May 8, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Setting Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The Settlement Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 09:00 AM shall take place in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
April 5, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for May 15, 2018 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 480 Picacho Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (sls)
March 1, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for April 30, 2018 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 480 Picacho Courtroom (South Tower). Plaintiff's letter due to Defendants: April 9, 2018; Defendants' letter due to Plaintiff: April 16, 2018; position papers due to Court: April 23, 2018. (sls)
February 22, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cody R Rogers/Miller Stratvert P.A. is terminated as attorney(s) of record for Defendants; Attorney Cody R Rogers/Jarmie & Associates is substituted as attorney(s) of record for Defendants. (sls)
January 16, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for 3/21/2018 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 480 Picacho Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Plaintiff's letter due to Defendants: 02/27/2018; Defendants' letter due to Plaintiff: 03/06/2018; position papers due to Court: 03/13/2018. (sls)
September 26, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Discovery due by 3/26/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order to Court due by 7/31/2018. (sls)
August 25, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 9/26/2017 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2017. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/15/2017.(sls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Adams Radio Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams Radio Group, LLC
Represented By: Cody R Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams Radio Group of Las Cruces, LLC
Represented By: Cody R Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Rodriguez
Represented By: Alejandro Acosta, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?