Rooks v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: David L. Rooks
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2017cv00929
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Motion to Reverse or Remand due by 3/7/18. Response due by 5/7/18. Reply due by 5/22/18. (atc)
December 19, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Motion to Reverse or Remand Due 2/20/2018. Response Due 4/20/2018. Reply Due 5/4/2018. (atc)
September 13, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rooks v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Rooks
Represented By: Francesca J. MacDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?