Shultzaberger v. Hall et al

Plaintiff: Steve P. Shultzaberger
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv01028
Filed: October 12, 2017
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Kevin R. Sweazea
Presiding Judge: Gregory B. Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2018 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Supplement Discovery and the Deposition of Dr. Gregory Misenhimer. (cbf)
January 31, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Jury Selection & Trial set for 11/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Las Cruces - 480 Picacho Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2018 at 9:00 AM in Las Cruces - 480 Picacho Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (cbf)
January 17, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 19 Motion to Bifurcate (cbf)
December 6, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Discovery due by 6/29/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by 9/24/2018. (cbf)
October 30, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 12/5/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by 11/14/2017. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/20/2017. (cbf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shultzaberger v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve P. Shultzaberger
Represented By: Charles E Hawthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd Schwarz
Represented By: Jesika Marlene Ulibarri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?