Chanez v. Brennan et al
Plaintiff: Trina K Chanez
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan, Heath W Hodges, Robert L Ponce and Richard Oyer
Case Number: 2:2018cv00291
Filed: March 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Dona Ana
Presiding Judge: Gregory J. Fouratt
Presiding Judge: Kevin R. Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 108 Plaintiff's Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Doc. 97. Response due 10/3/2019. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (tah)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Discovery due by 8/12/2019. Motions due by 9/9/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/1/2019. (mm)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Discovery due by 8/12/2019. Motions due by 9/9/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/1/2019. (mm)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales referring 33 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Order of Substitution of Parties (Doc. 27) and Challenge to Certification of U.S. Attorney (Doc. 23-1) to Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (tah)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 12/12/2018 at 02:30 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's "Meet Me" line at (505) 348-2695 to be connected to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2018. (mm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chanez v. Brennan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina K Chanez
Represented By: Raul A. Carrillo, Jr.
Represented By: Steven E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath W Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Ponce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Oyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?