Jager v. Mulheron et al
Plaintiff: Todd Jager
Defendant: Lilian A Klinger, Centene Corporation, John Doe, Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, James Mulheron, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, MHM Services, Inc., Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion, LLC, Sheri Pierce and Centurion Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00743
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Dona Ana
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing Fee Received: $ 505 receipt number 1084-6942322 re #193 Notice of Appeal filed by Todd Jager (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Strickland, Margaret)
February 5, 2020 Filing 193 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Todd Jager. (Filing Fee - Online Payment) (Strickland, Margaret)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Vacating #189 Status Conference and Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 FINAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (ts)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #126 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #185 Motion to Remand to State Court; finding as moot #125 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot #129 Motion for Summary Judgment. Counts I and II of the Third Amended Complaint are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Counts III, IV, and V of the Third Amended Complaint are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (ts)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference and Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Settlement Conference is set for 2/25/2020 at 9:00 AM in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 2/18/2020 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ag)
January 27, 2020 Filing 188 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza: Status Conference held on 1/27/2020. (ag)
January 23, 2020 Filing 187 BRIEF regarding Supplemental Jurisdiction by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. (Grubel, James)
January 21, 2020 Filing 186 NOTICE by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. re #185 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Stipulated Extension of Time (Grubel, James)
January 21, 2020 Filing 185 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret)
January 14, 2020 Filing 184 Clerk's Minutes for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth on 1/14/2020 re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #126 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Recording Info: Liberty Dona Ana) (jls)
January 10, 2020 Filing 183 REPLY to Response to Motion re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II, IV, and IV to Plaintiff's Surreply filed by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc.. (Grubel, James)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #172 Motion to Vacate Trial Setting and Pre-Trial Deadlines. Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2020 at 11:00 AM in Las Cruces - 360 Dona Ana Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Jury Trial set for 5/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in Las Cruces - Courtroom TBD before Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (jls)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 1/27/2020 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ag)
January 7, 2020 Filing 180 SUR REPLY re #166 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #126 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Constitutional Claims (Counts I and II), #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II, IV, and IV by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - 360 Dona Ana Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (ts)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #176 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. Plaintiff's surreply due 01/07/20. Defendants' reply to surreply due 01/11/20. (ts)
January 6, 2020 Filing 177 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth: Motion Hearing held on 1/6/2020 re #172 Opposed MOTION to Vacate Trial Setting and Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by Sheri Pierce, Eduardo Castrejon, Centene Corporation, MHM Services, Inc., Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Lilian A Klinger, Jose G. Andrade-Barraza. (Recording Info: Liberty Dona Ana) (ts)
January 6, 2020 Filing 176 MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret)
January 2, 2020 Filing 175 REPLY to Response to Motion re #172 Opposed MOTION to Vacate Trial Setting and Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc.. (Grubel, James)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #172 Opposed MOTION to Vacate Trial Setting and Pre-Trial Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2020 at 11:00 AM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to connect to proceedings. (ts)
December 20, 2019 Filing 173 RESPONSE in Opposition re #172 Opposed MOTION to Vacate Trial Setting and Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret)
December 19, 2019 Filing 172 Opposed MOTION to Vacate Trial Setting and Pre-Trial Deadlines by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc.. (Grubel, James)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth denying #128 Motion to Strike; denying #130 Motion to Strike. (ts)
December 17, 2019 Filing 170 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza: Status Conference held on 12/17/2019. (ag)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #168 Motion to Extend. (jls)
December 13, 2019 Filing 168 Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Time by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret)
December 13, 2019 Filing 167 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II, IV, and IV filed by Sheri Pierce, Eduardo Castrejon, Centene Corporation, MHM Services, Inc., Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Lilian A Klinger, Jose G. Andrade-Barraza (Grubel, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 166 REPLY to Response to Motion re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II, IV, and IV filed by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Grubel, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Centene Corporation, MHM Services, Inc. re #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Centene Corporation, MHM Services, Inc. (Grubel, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 164 REPLY to Response to Motion re #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Centene Corporation, MHM Services, Inc.. (Grubel, James)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #162 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (jls)
December 12, 2019 Filing 162 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc.. (Grubel, James)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #160 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II, IV, and IV. Reply due by 12/13/2019. (ts)
December 6, 2019 Filing 160 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II, IV, and IV by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc.. (Grubel, James)
December 6, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. re #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Agreed Extension of Time (Grubel, James)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 12/17/2019 at 1:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ag)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting unopposed extension of time to file reply to #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II, IV, and IV. Reply due 12/6/19. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ts)
November 25, 2019 Filing 157 Clerk's Minutes for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth on 11/25/2019 re #128 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of John R. Reid, M.D. and #130 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of Farhan Tagizideh, M.D.. (jls)
November 21, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. re #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Agreed Extension of Time (Grubel, James)
November 19, 2019 Filing 153 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #152 Appendix/Supplement, #150 Appendix/Supplement, #148 Order, #151 Appendix/Supplement Pages 181-252 of Exhibit 88 of Farhan Taghiadeh, M.D. Deposition by Todd Jager (Strickland, Margaret)
November 19, 2019 Filing 152 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #150 Appendix/Supplement, #148 Order, #151 Appendix/Supplement Pages 101-180 of Exhibit 88 of Farhan Taghizadeh, M.D. by Todd Jager (Strickland, Margaret)
November 19, 2019 Filing 151 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #150 Appendix/Supplement, #148 Order Pages 1-100 of Exhibit 88 of Farhan Taghizadeh, M.D. Deposition by Todd Jager (Strickland, Margaret)
November 19, 2019 Filing 150 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #148 Order Deposition Transcrip with Exhibits of Farhan Taghizadeh, M.D. by Todd Jager (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement) (Strickland, Margaret)
November 19, 2019 Filing 149 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #148 Order Deposition Transcript of John R. Reid, M.D. by Todd Jager (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement) (Strickland, Margaret)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (ts)
November 18, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE REGARDING TELEPHONIC HEARING by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Counsel may attend the motion hearing set for 11/25/19 at 1:30 p.m. either telephonically or in person. (ts)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth Setting Hearing on Motions #130 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of Farhan Tagizideh, M.D., and #128 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of John R. Reid, M.D. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2019 at 01:30 PM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to connect to proceedings. (ts)
November 15, 2019 Filing 145 RESPONSE to Motion re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II, IV, and IV of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Todd Jager. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (McGraw, Mollie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 144 RESPONSE to Motion re #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Todd Jager. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L) (McGraw, Mollie)
November 13, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. re #128 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of John R. Reid, M.D. filed by Sheri Pierce, Eduardo Castrejon, Centene Corporation, MHM Services, Inc., Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Lilian A Klinger, Jose G. Andrade-Barraza (Grubel, James)
November 13, 2019 Filing 142 REPLY to Response to Motion re #128 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of John R. Reid, M.D. filed by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc.. (Grubel, James)
November 13, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. re #130 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of Farhan Tagizideh, M.D. filed by Sheri Pierce, Eduardo Castrejon, Centene Corporation, MHM Services, Inc., Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Lilian A Klinger, Jose G. Andrade-Barraza (Grubel, James)
November 13, 2019 Filing 140 REPLY to Response to Motion re #130 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of Farhan Tagizideh, M.D. filed by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc.. (Grubel, James)
November 11, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. re #130 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of Farhan Tagizideh, M.D. of Agreed Extension of Time (Grubel, James)
November 11, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. re #128 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of John R. Reid, M.D. of Agreed Extension of Time (Grubel, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. re #126 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Constitutional Claims (Counts I and II) filed by Sheri Pierce, Eduardo Castrejon, Centene Corporation, MHM Services, Inc., Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Lilian A Klinger, Jose G. Andrade-Barraza (Grubel, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 136 REPLY to Response to Motion re #126 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Constitutional Claims (Counts I and II) filed by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Grubel, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 135 RESPONSE to Motion re #130 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of Farhan Tagizideh, M.D. filed by Todd Jager. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Strickland, Margaret)
October 28, 2019 Filing 134 RESPONSE to Motion re #128 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of John R. Reid, M.D. filed by Todd Jager. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Strickland, Margaret)
October 25, 2019 Filing 133 RESPONSE to Motion re #126 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Constitutional Claims (Counts I and II) filed by Todd Jager. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Strickland, Margaret)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #131 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II, IV, and IV. Responses due by 11/15/2019. (ts)
October 24, 2019 Filing 131 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II, IV, and IV, #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret)
October 15, 2019 Filing 130 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of Farhan Tagizideh, M.D. by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc.. (Grubel, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 129 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Centene Corporation, MHM Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Grubel, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 128 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of John R. Reid, M.D. by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Grubel, James)
October 15, 2019 Filing 127 ERRATA re #125 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II, IV, and IV inclusion of deposition of JR Reid by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Dep. of JR Reid) (Grubel, James)
October 14, 2019 Filing 126 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Constitutional Claims (Counts I and II) by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc.. (Grubel, James)
October 14, 2019 Filing 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts II, IV, and IV by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit c, #4 Exhibit d, #5 Exhibit e, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Grubel, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Disclosure of Bates 912-914 (Strickland, Margaret)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER CLARIFYING PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2020. (jls)
September 18, 2019 Filing 122 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Disclosure of Bates 496-911 (Strickland, Margaret)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Vacating the August 28, 2019, settlement conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 120 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza: Status Conference held on 8/20/2019. (atc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Bates 495 (Strickland, Margaret)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #117 Unopposed Motion to Extend Pretrial Motions Deadline by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Pretrial Motions due 10/15/19. (atc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 117 MOTION to Extend (other) Motion Deadline by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Grubel, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Bates 494 (Strickland, Margaret)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING THE DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS CENTURION, LLC AND CENTURION GROUP, INC. by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (bni)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #113 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to complete out-of-state expert witness depositions by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Grubel, James)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #111 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #97 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (bni)
July 29, 2019 Filing 111 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #97 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Centurion Group, Inc., Centurion, LLC. (Grubel, James)
July 29, 2019 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Supplemental Disclosure of Bates 469-493 (Strickland, Margaret)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #108 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #97 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response due by 7/29/2019 (ts)
July 19, 2019 Filing 108 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiff's Second Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret)
July 18, 2019 Filing 107 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza: Status Conference held on 7/18/2019. (ag)
July 17, 2019 Filing 106 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sheri Pierce First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production (Grubel, James)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing for 7/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (atc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosure of Bates 462-468 (Strickland, Margaret)
July 5, 2019 Filing 103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. Centurion Defendants' Expert Disclosures (Grubel, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 102 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC Responses to Second Requests for Production (Grubel, James)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #100 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #97 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response due by 7/19/2019. (ts)
June 25, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiff' Motion to Extend His Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret)
June 24, 2019 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Answers to Defendants' Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents and Request for Admissions (Strickland, Margaret)
June 21, 2019 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiffs Disclosure Bates 424-461 (Strickland, Margaret)
June 7, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Centurion Group, Inc., Centurion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Grubel, James)
June 7, 2019 Filing 96 ANSWER to #90 Amended Complaint, Third Amended Complaint by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Eduardo Castrejon, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc..(Grubel, James)
June 6, 2019 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Expert Material Bates No. 423 (Strickland, Margaret)
June 5, 2019 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Expert Material Disclosure with Bates 409 to 422 (Strickland, Margaret)
June 3, 2019 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Certificate of Service on Defendant Centurion, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strickland, Margaret)
June 3, 2019 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Certificate of Service on Defendant Centurion Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strickland, Margaret)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Telephonic status Conference is set for 8/20/2019 at 02:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] A Settlement Conference is set for 8/28/2019 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
May 28, 2019 Summons on Third Amended Complaint Issued as to Eduardo Castrejon. (ln)
May 24, 2019 Filing 90 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint for the Recovery of Damages Caused by the Deprivation of Civil Rights, Negligence and Medical Malpractice and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. adding Eduardo Castrejon and Eduardo Castrejon., filed by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #86 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
May 23, 2019 Filing 88 Amended ANSWER to #81 Amended Complaint, by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc..(Grubel, James)
May 22, 2019 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC First set of Discovery to Plaintiff (Grubel, James)
May 22, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Todd Jager. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Strickland, Margaret)
May 21, 2019 Filing 85 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza: Status Conference held on 5/21/2019. (atc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 84 ANSWER to #81 Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc..(Grubel, James)
May 15, 2019 Summons Issued on Second Amended Complaint as to Centurion Group, Inc., Centurion, LLC, MHM Services, Inc.. (mnb)
May 14, 2019 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Second Set of RFP to Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (Strickland, Margaret)
May 10, 2019 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiffs Supplemental Rule 26 (A)(1) Disclosures (Bates 395 to 408) (Strickland, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 Filing 81 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint for the Recovery of Damages Caused by the Deprivation of Civil Rights, Negligence and Medical Malpractice and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants., filed by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #78 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Mulheron with prejudice. (bni)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #77 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Plain. Complaint Against James Mulheron with Prejudice by James Mulheron. (Evans, Bryan)
May 1, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for the Recovery of Damages Caused by the Deprivation of Civil Rights and Jury Trial Demand by Todd Jager. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Strickland, Margaret)
April 9, 2019 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. Fourth Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Grubel, James)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Stipulated Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Discovery due by 8/5/2019. Pretrial Motions due by 8/29/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by 10/7/2019. (atc)
March 29, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION to Extend (other) Stipulated Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadlines by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 5/21/2019 at 02:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (atc)
March 19, 2019 Filing 72 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza: Status Conference held on 3/19/2019. (atc)
March 8, 2019 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Mulheron of Defendant James Mulheron's Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Defendant James Mulheron's Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production (Evans, Bryan) Modified text on 3/11/2019 (yc).
March 7, 2019 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. Third Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Grubel, James)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines to Join Parties and Amend Pleadings by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
February 22, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION to Extend (other) Stipulation Motion to Extend the Deadlines to Join Additional Parties and Amended Pleadings by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret)
February 19, 2019 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lilian A Klinger Answers to Plaintiff's First and Second Set of Interrogatories (Grubel, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. Centurion Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's First and Second Discovery Requests (Grubel, James)
February 7, 2019 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Answers to Defendant Mulheron's Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production of Documents and Bates No. 1-394 (Strickland, Margaret)
February 1, 2019 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Grubel, James)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 11:00 AM in Las Cruces - 360 Dona Ana Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Jury Trial set for 2/24/2020 at 09:30 AM in Las Cruces - Courtroom to be determined before Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (ts)
January 17, 2019 Filing 62 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth: Trial Scheduling Conference held on 1/17/2019. (ts)
January 16, 2019 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. First Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Grubel, James)
January 15, 2019 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Sheri Pierce (Strickland, Margaret)
January 15, 2019 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Lilian A. Klinger (Strickland, Margaret)
January 15, 2019 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Jose Andrade-Barraza, MD (Strickland, Margaret)
January 15, 2019 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Centurion (Strickland, Margaret)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 3/19/2019 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (atc)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Discovery due by 7/9/2019. Pretrial Motions due by 8/8/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by 10/7/2019. (atc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 53 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza: Scheduling Conference held on 1/10/2019. (atc)
January 9, 2019 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce Initial Disclosures (Grubel, James)
January 9, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by James J Grubel on behalf of Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc. (Grubel, James)
January 7, 2019 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff' Interrogatories and Request for Production to Defendant Sheri Pierce (Strickland, Margaret)
January 7, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff' Interrogatories to Defendant Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (Strickland, Margaret)
January 7, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff' Interrogatories and Request for Production to Defendant Lilian A. Klinger, CNP (Strickland, Margaret)
January 7, 2019 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff' Interrogatories and Request for Production to Defendant Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, MD (Strickland, Margaret)
January 7, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff' Interrogatories and Request for Production to Defendant James Mulheron (Strickland, Margaret)
January 7, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Mulheron to Defendant James Mulheron's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiff (Evans, Bryan)
January 4, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Mulheron to Defendant James Mulheron's Initial Disclosures (Evans, Bryan)
January 4, 2019 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in Civil Action and First Amended Complaint to Recover Damages served on Sheri Pierce on December 23, 2018, filed by Todd Jager. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strickland, Margaret)
January 4, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures (Strickland, Margaret)
January 3, 2019 Filing 41 Joint Status Report by Todd Jager (Strickland, Margaret)
January 2, 2019 Filing 40 Defendant James Mulheron's ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint by James Mulheron.(Evans, Bryan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 39 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, Sheri Pierce, MHM Services, Inc..(White, Geoffrey)
December 14, 2018 Summons Issued as to Sheri Pierce. (jg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants. adding Sheri Pierce and Sheri Pierce. terminating John Doe., filed by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 02:30 PM. (bni)
December 12, 2018 Filing 36 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 1/3/2019. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is reset for 1/10/2019 at 03:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (atc)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #30 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. (bni)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth denying #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Qualified Immunity. (ts)
November 26, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE by James Mulheron of Agreed Upon Extension (Evans, Bryan)
November 26, 2018 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Reply to Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centeno Corporation, MHM Services, Inc., Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, M.D. and Lilian A. Klinger, CNP's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret)
November 19, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, MHM Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Park, Alfred)
November 8, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Todd Jager. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Strickland, Margaret)
October 29, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by James Mulheron re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Qualified Immunity filed by James Mulheron (Evans, Bryan)
October 29, 2018 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Qualified Immunity filed by James Mulheron. (Evans, Bryan)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Qualified Immunity. Reply due by 10/29/2018. (ts)
October 15, 2018 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Qualified Immunity by James Mulheron. (Evans, Bryan)
October 2, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 16 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Centene Corporation, MHM Services, Inc., Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Lilian A Klinger, Jose G. Andrade-Barraza; 19 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by James Mulheron; 15 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Todd Jager. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kls)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery and Vacating the October 23, 2018 Scheduling Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
September 28, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Qualified Immunity Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Todd Jager. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Strickland, Margaret)
September 28, 2018 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and Stay of Scheduling Order Deadlines Pending a Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by James Mulheron. (Evans, Bryan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE by Centene Corporation Disclosure Statement (White, Geoffrey)
September 25, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by MHM Services, Inc. Disclosure Statement (White, Geoffrey)
September 21, 2018 Filing 19 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), James Mulheron voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Evans, Bryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Qualified Immunity by James Mulheron. (Evans, Bryan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan D Evans on behalf of James Mulheron (Evans, Bryan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 16 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, MHM Services, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (White, Geoffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Todd Jager voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Strickland, Margaret)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 10/16/2018. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 10/23/2018 at 03:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at (505) 348-2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/3/2018. (atc)
August 30, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey D White on behalf of Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, MHM Services, Inc. (White, Geoffrey)
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, MHM Services, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Todd Jager.(Park, Alfred)
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred A Park on behalf of Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, MHM Services, Inc. (Park, Alfred)
August 29, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Jager. James Mulheron served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018. (Strickland, Margaret)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Jager. MHM Services, Inc. served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. (Strickland, Margaret)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Jager. Lilian A Klinger served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018. (Strickland, Margaret)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Jager. Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018. (Strickland, Margaret)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Jager. Centene Corporation served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. (Strickland, Margaret)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Jager. Jose G. Andrade-Barraza served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018. (Strickland, Margaret)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint to Recovery Damages and Summons Proof of Service served on James Mulheron, Joe G. Andrade-Barraza, M.D. and Lilian A. Klinger, C.N.P. on August 7, 2018, filed by Todd Jager. (Strickland, Margaret) Modified text to add error spoke to Margaret they will refile the summons tomorrow on 8/28/2018 (nr).
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 FILED IN ERROR CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Todd Jager For Complaint and Summons for the Recovery of Damages Caused By the Deprivation of Civil Rights (Strickland, Margaret) Modified text to add error spoke to Margaret and she states they will refile the summons tomorrow on 8/28/2018 (nr).
August 6, 2018 Summons Issued as to Jose G. Andrade-Barraza, Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, Centene Corporation, Lilian A Klinger, James Mulheron, MHM Services, Inc.. (mnb)
August 6, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-5956361 re #1 Complaint, filed by Todd Jager (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Strickland, Margaret)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
August 3, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (kdh)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For the Recovery of Damages Caused by the Deprivation of Civil Rights, Negligence and Medical Malpractice and Demand for Jury Trial against Todd Jager ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Todd Jager. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strickland, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jager v. Mulheron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Jager
Represented By: Mollie C. McGraw
Represented By: Margaret Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilian A Klinger
Represented By: Geoffrey D White
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: James J Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Represented By: Geoffrey D White
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: James J Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose G. Andrade-Barraza
Represented By: Geoffrey D White
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: James J Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mulheron
Represented By: Quincy Jean Perales
Represented By: Carla Neusch Williams
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey D White
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: James J Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Services, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Castrejon
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Represented By: James J Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri Pierce
Represented By: James J Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?