Felps v. Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jonathan Felps
Defendant: Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00811
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
2 Judge: Carmen E Garza
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. United States District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 10/29/2018 at 02:30 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's "Meet Me" line at (505) 348-2695 to be connected to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2018. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/10/2018. (mm)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Jonathan Felps.(Olson, Richard)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Felps. Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc. served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Verrett, Daniel)
August 22, 2018 Summons Issued as to Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc. (ln)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
August 22, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (ln)
August 22, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-5986618 re #1 Complaint filed by Jonathan Felps (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Verrett, Daniel)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jonathan Felps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent of Jonathan Felps, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Verrett, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felps v. Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Felps
Represented By: Daniel A. Verrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard E. Olson
Represented By: John Bridges Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?