Phillips v. Roosevelt County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Tyler S. Phillips
Defendant: Roosevelt County Detention Center and FNU Galloges
Case Number: 2:2018cv00918
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 Letter by Tyler S. Philips (gr)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff's Show-Cause Response is due by December 14, 2018. (jcm)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephan M. VIdmar by District Judge Martha Vazquez. (gr)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 Second MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Tyler S. Phillips. (gr)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Tyler S. Phillips. (gr)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 REDACTED NOTICE of Booking Report by Tyler S. Phillips. (gr) Modified text on 10/17/2018 add redact language (gr).
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Tyler S. Phillips. (gr)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 4 Notice of Judge Reassignment. Mail sent to Tyler S. Phillips. (gr)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Cure Defects by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff must cure defects no later than November 1, 2018. (jcm)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT CAUSE*** PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) Modified on 10/2/2018 (jg).
October 1, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Tyler S. Phillips. (jg)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tyler S. Phillips. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Roosevelt County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler S. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roosevelt County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Galloges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?