Nanez v. Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society
Plaintiff: Regina Nanez
Defendant: The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society and Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society
Case Number: 2:2018cv00968
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
2 Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER REFERRING CASE to Arbitration. by District Judge Martha Vazquez. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is referred to arbitration pursuant to the arbitration clause in the admission agreement signed by the parties. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is held in abeyance until further order of the Court. (gr)
November 16, 2018 Case Stayed pursuant to Stipulated Order. (gr)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society of Filing State Court Record (Brown, Martha)
November 2, 2018 District Judge Martha Vazquez assigned. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to case. (kdh)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Because the parties' request to pursue arbitration and hold this matter in abeyance is outside the authority of a magistrate judge, the presiding judge may not grant the relief requested without the consent of the parties. Therefore, the parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 7 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cbf)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society of Submission of Stipulated Order Referring Case to Arbitration in Lieu of Filing Answer (Brown, Martha)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee received: Paid online $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-6087294 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society d/b/a/ Good Samaritan Society - Las Cruces Village from Third Judicial District Court, case number D-307-CV-2018-00345. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society d/b/a/ Good Samaritan Society - Las Cruces Village. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Martha)
October 18, 2018 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (mnb)
October 18, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (mnb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nanez v. Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society
Represented By: Martha G Brown
Represented By: Deana M Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society
Represented By: Martha G Brown
Represented By: Deana M Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Nanez
Represented By: Russell Dean Clark
Represented By: Matthew G Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?