Huddleston v. Martinez et al

Plaintiff: David Lee Huddleston
Defendant: John Monforte, Susana Martinez and Anthony Moya
Case Number: 2:2018cv01075
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Lee Huddleston. (vh)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Cure Deficiency: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (cbf)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (jg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 19, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)
November 19, 2018 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Lee Huddleston. (gr)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Lee Huddleston. (gr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huddleston v. Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Monforte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susana Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Moya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?