Western Agricultural Insurance Company v. Whitney Farms, LP
Plaintiff: Western Agricultural Insurance Company
Defendant: Whitney Farms, LP
Case Number: 2:2018cv01188
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff must appear telephonically on March 19, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. to show cause why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (am)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Whitney Farms, LP., filed by Western Agricultural Insurance Company. (Dunford, Thomas)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Shepherd on behalf of Whitney Farms, LP (Shepherd, Edward)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff is granted leave file a second amended complaint no later than February 5, 2019. (am)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Whitney Farms, LP., filed by Western Agricultural Insurance Company. (Dunford, Thomas)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend its #1 Complaint no later than January 23, 2019. (am)
December 20, 2018 Summons Issued as to Whitney Farms, LP. (jg)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
December 18, 2018 Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (kdh)
December 18, 2018 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (kdh)
December 18, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6188536 re #1 Complaint filed by Western Agricultural Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Dunford, Thomas)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Whitney Farms, LP ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Western Agricultural Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunford, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Agricultural Insurance Company v. Whitney Farms, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Farms, LP
Represented By: Edward Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Agricultural Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Dunford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?