Turner v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Cally Turner
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, TRW Automotive U.S. LLC and TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01217
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: David H Urias
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by District Judge David H. Urias. (arp)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER VACATING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. In light of the parties' #67 Settlement, the 66 Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/12/2022 at 1:15 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt is hereby VACATED. (nmh)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. (Rinner, Todd) Modified text on 4/18/2022 (arp).
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/12/2022 at 1:15 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. This purpose of this conference will be to discuss scheduling a settlement conference. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. (nmh)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge David H. Urias as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR AMENDMENT OF SCHEDULING DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Pretrial Motions due 6/17/2022. (nmh)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Joint MOTION to Extend (other) For Further Amendment of Deadlines Due to COVID-19 by Ford Motor Company. (Rinner, Todd)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR AMENDMENT OF SCHEDULING DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (nmh)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion For Fourth Amendment of Scheduling Deadlines Due to COVID-19 by Cally Turner. (Pittman, Adam)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt granting #59 Motion for Third Amendment of Scheduling Deadlines. (gbg)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion For Third Amendment of Scheduling Deadlines Due to COVID-19 by Cally Turner. (Pittman, Adam)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt granting #56 Motion for Second Amendment of Scheduling Deadlines. (gbg)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt granting #56 Motion for Second Amendment of Scheduling Deadlines. (mm)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery -- JOINT MOTION FOR SECOND AMENDMENT OF SCHEDULING DEADLINES DUE TO COVID-19 by Ford Motor Company. (Rinner, Todd)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt granting #54 Motion to Extend. (mm)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Joint Motion for Amendment of Scheduling Deadlines by Ford Motor Company. (Rinner, Todd)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #33 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant ZF Passive Safety Systems US Inc. (f/k/a TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc.) is terminated. (tah)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. (Hartman, Jason)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Statement of Non-Opposition) filed by Cally Turner. (Pittman, Adam)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Notice of Stipulated Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Stipulated Extension of Time to Respond by Cally Turner. (Pittman, Adam) Modified text as per chambers on 11/21/2019 (jjs).
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Notice of Stipulated Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Stipulated Extension of Time to Respond by Cally Turner. (Pittman, Adam) Modified text on 10/4/2019 (jjs).
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (mm)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE by Cally Turner re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Stipulated Extension of Time to Respond) (Pittman, Adam)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. Notice of Name Change (Hartman, Jason)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE by Cally Turner re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Extension of Time to Respond (Pittman, Adam)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Rory Riley on behalf of Cally Turner (Riley, Rory) Modified restriction on 7/12/2019 (jjs).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Rory Riley on behalf of Cally Turner (Riley, Rory) Modified restriction on 7/12/2019 (jjs).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. TRW VSSI's responses to 1st ROGs RFPs RFAs from Plaintiff (Hartman, Jason)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company (Ford's responses to 1st ROGs RFPs RFAs from Plaintiff) (Rinner, Todd)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. of Non-Availability (Mynatt, Blaine)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW #37 by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (mm)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Leila Watson on behalf of Cally Turner (Watson, Leila)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cally Turner. (Turnbull, Douglas)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt granting #35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (mm)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cally Turner. (Berger, Kylee)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE by Cally Turner re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Extension of Time to Respond) (Pittman, Adam)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hartman, Jason)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Discovery terminates 12/1/2020. Motions due by 1/29/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/29/2021. (mm)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Clerk's Minutes for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 5/3/2019 before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (mm)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine T Mynatt on behalf of TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. (Mynatt, Blaine)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The telephonic Rule 16(c) conference originally set for 5/1/2019 at 02:30 PM is hereby RESET to 5/3/2019 at 02:30 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use Code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mm)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Joint Status Report by Cally Turner (Pittman, Adam)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to TRW Automotive U.S. LLC by Cally Turner (Pittman, Adam)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE by TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. re 25 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Notice of Good Standing (Mynatt, Blaine)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. by Blaine T Mynatt on behalf of: David B. Weinstein Weinstein Tippetts & Little LLP 7660 San Felipe, Suite 500Houston, TX 77063 713-244-0800 Fax 713-244-0801 david.weinstein@wtllaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Mynatt, Blaine)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6376661 re: # 25 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc., TRW Automotive U.S. LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Mynatt, Blaine)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 21 and 22. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by March 26, 2019. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRW Automotive U.S. LLC (Mynatt, Blaine)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. for TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc.. (Mynatt, Blaine)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRW Automotive USLLC's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by TRW Automotive U.S. LLC.(Mynatt, Blaine)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TRW Vehicle Safety System Inc.'s ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc..(Mynatt, Blaine)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine T Mynatt on behalf of TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. (Mynatt, Blaine)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Pittman on behalf of Cally Turner (Pittman, Adam)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Tanner on behalf of Cally Turner (Tanner, James)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Turnbull on behalf of Cally Turner (Turnbull, Douglas)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 5/1/2019 at 02:30 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use Code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 4/24/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/26/2019. (mm)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company (Rinner, Todd)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Rinner, Todd)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cally Turner. TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Berger, Kylee)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cally Turner. TRW Automotive U.S. LLC served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Berger, Kylee)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cally Turner. Ford Motor Company served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Berger, Kylee)
January 23, 2019 Summons on Amended Complaint Issued as to Ford Motor Company, TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc.. (jg)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Cally Turner. (Berger, Kylee)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend #1 her Complaint no later than January 24, 2019. (am)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 1084-6198352 re #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Cally Turner. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berger, Kylee) filed by Cally Turner (kg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Cally Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berger, Kylee)
December 26, 2018 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
December 26, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Todd Rinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive U.S. LLC
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Represented By: David B. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc.
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Represented By: David B. Weinstein
Represented By: Jason Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cally Turner
Represented By: Kylee Jael Berger
Represented By: Douglas Brett Turnbull
Represented By: Adam Pittman
Represented By: James C. Tanner
Represented By: Leila Watson
Represented By: Rory B. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?