Grim v. FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Grim
Defendant: Rafter J Bar Enterprise, Inc., Bobby Ramon, Curry Enterprise, LLC, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. and Budget Truck Rental, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00010
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than March 11, 2019 unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (ag)
February 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Budget Truck Rental, LLC. (McDowell, Cory)
February 18, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by John Grim.(Nelson, Pawan)
February 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Pawan Nelson on behalf of FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. (Nelson, Pawan)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Budget Truck Rental, LLC's answer is due no later than 2/18/2019. (bni)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs Original Complaint and Motions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Budget Truck Rental, LLC. (McDowell, Cory)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory M. McDowell on behalf of Budget Truck Rental, LLC (McDowell, Cory)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Grim. Budget Truck Rental, LLC served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Sloan, John)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Grim. FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Sloan, John)
January 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Curry Enterprise, LLC. (ln)
January 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Budget Truck Rental, LLC, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., Rafter J Bar Enterprise, Inc., Bobby Ramon. (ln)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by John Grim re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Sloan, John)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
January 8, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (ln)
January 8, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces) (Curry County). (ln)
January 8, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6211745 re #1 Complaint filed by John Grim (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sloan, John)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by John Grim. (Sloan, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grim v. FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafter J Bar Enterprise, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Ramon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry Enterprise, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.
Represented By: Pawan Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budget Truck Rental, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Randall Kugler
Represented By: Cory M. McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Grim
Represented By: Rachael Jones
Represented By: John D Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?