Meadows v. International Laboratories, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Luell Meadows
Defendant: International Laboratories, LLC and WalMart, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00024
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
2 Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 10. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 Transmittal of State Court Documents by WalMart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 4/18/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court, a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/1/2019. (gbg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by International Laboratories, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Joinder in Removal (Berger, Alissa)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by International Laboratories, LLC. (Berger, Alissa)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WalMart, Inc. (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Wal-Mart's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Negligent Dispensing of Prescription Drugs and Product Liability by WalMart, Inc.. (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by WalMart, Inc. of Agreed Extension of Time to File Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership's Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Roach Martin, Tiffany)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 11, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg)
January 11, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
January 11, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6222112 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by WalMart, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Roach Martin, Tiffany)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WalMart, Inc. from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2018-08652. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by WalMart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roach Martin, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadows v. International Laboratories, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luell Meadows
Represented By: Stephen F. Lawless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart, Inc.
Represented By: Dominic A Martinez
Represented By: Tiffany L Roach Martin
Represented By: Rufus E. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?