Nunez v. New Mexico Corrections Department et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Nunez
Defendant: Correctional Properties Trust, Jane Doe, Gregg Marcantel, John Doe, New Mexico Corrections Department, Rose Bobchack, David Jablonski, GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC and Raymond Smith
Case Number: 2:2019cv00063
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by New Mexico Corrections Department re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New Mexico Corrections Department (Green, Chelsea)
February 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC re #16 Response to Motion (NMCD Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's Letter/Motion to Appoint Counsel) (Jahner, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC re #5 MOTION to Stay (Jahner, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC. (Jahner, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by New Mexico Corrections Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Shanor, Stephen)
February 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Notice of Consent) (Jahner, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 Transmittal of State Court Documents by New Mexico Corrections Department (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y) (Shanor, Stephen)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO VACATE INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. The telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque is VACATED and will be reset at a later date, if necessary. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FILED IN ERROR****ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #5 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings, including all discovery, pending resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (tah) Modified on 2/5/2019 (yc).
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by New Mexico Corrections Department of Plaintiff's Opposition to the NMCD Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings (Shanor, Stephen)
February 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to Rose Bobchack, Correctional Properties Trust, Jane Doe, John Doe, GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC, Raymond Smith. (mnb)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Nunez re #3 Initial Scheduling Order, #1 Notice of Removal, (Thompson, Dwight)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dwight E. Thompson terminated. The Clerk is directed to send copies of all of the documents that have been filed with the Court, including this order, and a pro se packet to Mr. Andrew Nunez. (cda)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Andrew Nunez. (Thompson, Dwight)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by New Mexico Corrections Department re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Shanor, Stephen)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay by New Mexico Corrections Department. (Shanor, Stephen) Modified to unterm motion on 2/5/2019 (yc).
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by New Mexico Corrections Department. (Shanor, Stephen)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 4/3/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 3/27/2019. (pv)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB042498 (mnb)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 22, 2019 United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
January 22, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Mexico Corrections Department and David Jablonski from 5th Judicial District - Chaves County, case number d-504-cv-2017-00968. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by New Mexico Corrections Department. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Green, Chelsea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez v. New Mexico Corrections Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Properties Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Marcantel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Corrections Department
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Chelsea Rae Green
Represented By: Alyssa Dawn Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Bobchack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jablonski
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Chelsea Rae Green
Represented By: Alyssa Dawn Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Jahner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Nunez
Represented By: Dwight E. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?