Schaap et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Art Schaap and Renee Schaap
Defendant: THE CHEMOURS COMPANY L.L.C., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, NATIONAL FOAM, INC., E.I DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, 3M Company, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS L.P., Chemours Company L.L.C., E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Inc. and Chemours Company FC, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00105
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (bni)
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Affidavit of Service for National Foam served on Lindsey Brunson on 02/19/2019, filed by Art Schaap, Renee Schaap. (Knudson, Randy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee Schaap, Art Schaap. Chemours Company L.L.C. served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Knudson, Randy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee Schaap, Art Schaap. Chemours Company FC, LLC served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Knudson, Randy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee Schaap, Art Schaap. 3M Company served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Knudson, Randy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renee Schaap, Art Schaap. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Inc. served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Knudson, Randy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 FILED IN ERROR-ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed E.I DUPONT Summons Proof of Service Acknowledgement filed by Art Schaap, Renee Schaap. (Knudson, Randy) Modified on 3/18/2019 (vv).
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Renee Schaap, Art Schaap as to Buckeye Fire Equipment Company. (Knudson, Randy)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint Stipulated Motion Extending Dupont and Chemours' time to Respond by Art Schaap. (Knudson, Randy)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (bni)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B Johnson on behalf of Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. (Johnson, Eric)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by 3M Company, Chemguard, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Johnson, Eric)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Renee Schaap, Art Schaap as to 3M Company. (Knudson, Randy)
February 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to Chemours Company L.L.C.. (kdh)
February 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., Chemours Company FC, LLC, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P.(kdh)
February 7, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6272010 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Renee Schaap, Art Schaap (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Knudson, Randy)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Art Schaap, Renee Schaap by Randy J. Knudson on behalf of: Tate J. Kunkle, Esq. Napoli Shkolnik PLLC 360 Lexington Ave., 11th FloorNew York, NY 10017 (212) 397-1000 Fax (646) 843-7603 tkunkle@napolilaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Knudson, Randy)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
February 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (mnb)
February 7, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6271910 re #1 Complaint filed by Renee Schaap, Art Schaap (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Knudson, Randy)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Renee Schaap, Art Schaap. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knudson, Randy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaap et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Art Schaap
Represented By: Randy J. Knudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Schaap
Represented By: Randy J. Knudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHEMOURS COMPANY L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL FOAM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEMGUARD, INC.
Represented By: Eric B Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS L.P.
Represented By: Eric B Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?