Berger et al v. Garrison Property and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Eliezer Joseph Berger and Paloma Reyes-Madrid
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Garrison Property and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00127
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Eliezer Joseph Berger Consent of Telephonic Hearing on April 23, 2019 (Lovett, Robert)
April 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Garrison Property and Casualty Company Notice of Consent to Telephonic Hearing on April 23, 2019 (Singer, Jessica)
April 10, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Garrison Property and Casualty Company Initial Disclosures (Singer, Jessica)
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER pursuant to the direction of District Judge James O. Browning, the Court will be in the Dallas, Texas area on 4/23/19 and that the Court would like to conduct the hearing out of district and by telephone. The purpose of this notice is, in part, to request consent from the parties to allow the Court to conduct the hearing out of district from the Dallas, Texas area. If the parties consent to the Court doing so, they should submit a filing with the Court so stating consent to allow the Court to conduct the hearing out of the district from the Dallas, Texas area. If they do not consent, they should submit a filing so stating and the hearing will be rescheduled. Should counsel also wish to appear telephonically for the hearing they should call the Court's AT&T Conference line at 1-888-684-8852, Access Code: 5469085.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cab)
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 10. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by District Judge James O. Browning. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 4/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. The telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference currently set for May 2, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (jcm)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Garrison Property and Casualty Company Interrogatories and Requests for Production to all Plaintiffs (Singer, Jessica)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by April 2, 2019. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (sju)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Garrison Property and Casualty Company Filing of State Court Record (Singer, Jessica)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Joint Status Report is due by April 9, 2019. A telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for May 2, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/19/2019. (jcm)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on February 26, 2019. (Recording Info: Liberty) (jcm)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for February 26, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (jcm)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh)
February 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (kdh)
February 14, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6283807 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Singer, Jessica)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Singer, Jessica)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Singer, Jessica)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Third Judicial District Court, case number D-307-CV-2018-02155. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Singer, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berger et al v. Garrison Property and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Ada B Priest
Represented By: Jessica Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrison Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Ada B Priest
Represented By: Jessica Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliezer Joseph Berger
Represented By: Robert L Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paloma Reyes-Madrid
Represented By: Robert L Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?