Preciado v. Board of Education of Clovis Municipal Schools
Plaintiff: Natalie Preciado
Defendant: Clovis Municipal Schools and Board of Education of Clovis Municipal Schools
Case Number: 2:2019cv00184
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Board of Education of Clovis Municipal Schools of Withdrawal of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel (Archuleta-Staehlin, Jacquelyn)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Karen Kilgore on behalf of Board of Education of Clovis Municipal Schools (Kilgore, M.)
March 12, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Natalie Preciado as to Board of Education of Clovis Municipal Schools. (Stewart, Gail)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 6, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)
March 6, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
March 6, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6318819 re #1 Complaint filed by Natalie Preciado (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stewart, Gail)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for award of attorney fees under IDEA against Clovis Municipal Schools ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Natalie Preciado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stewart, Gail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preciado v. Board of Education of Clovis Municipal Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Preciado
Represented By: Gail S Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clovis Municipal Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Clovis Municipal Schools
Represented By: Jacquelyn Archuleta-Staehlin
Represented By: M. Karen Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?