Clovis Municipal Schools Board of Education v. Preciado
Appellee: Natalie Preciado
Appellant: Clovis Municipal Schools Board of Education
Case Number: 2:2019cv00185
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Carmen E Garza
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Clovis Municipal Schools Board of Education of Withdrawal of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel (Archuleta-Staehlin, Jacquelyn)
May 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Clovis Municipal Schools Board of Education of Withdrawal of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel (Archuleta-Staehlin, Jacquelyn)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for May 16, 2019, at 2:00 p.m., and all associated deadlines by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 10. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Karen Kilgore on behalf of Clovis Municipal Schools Board of Education (Kilgore, M.)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT of the Record by Clovis Municipal Schools Board of Education (Attachments: #1 Supplement Partial Trial Transcript Vol 1, #2 Supplement Partial Trial Transcript Vol 2, #3 Supplement Partial Trail Transcript Vol 3, #4 Supplement Proceedings Before Hearing Officers, #5 Supplement Multidisciplinary Evaluation Report, #6 Supplement Disengagement Letter & Index) (Archuleta-Staehlin, Jacquelyn)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report due by 5/8/2019. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 5/16/2019 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/23/2019. (atc)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Natalie Preciado. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Clovis Municipal Schools Board of Education.(Stewart, Gail)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Clovis Municipal Schools Board of Education as to Natalie Preciado. (Archuleta-Staehlin, Jacquelyn)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee received online: $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-6318833 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 6, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (jg)
March 6, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 6 (Santa Fe) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review Pursuant to 20 U.S.C. 1415 against Natalie Preciado ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Clovis Municipal Schools Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Archuleta-Staehlin, Jacquelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clovis Municipal Schools Board of Education v. Preciado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Natalie Preciado
Represented By: Gail S Stewart
Represented By: M. Karen Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Clovis Municipal Schools Board of Education
Represented By: Jacquelyn Archuleta-Staehlin
Represented By: M. Karen Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?