King et al v. Lea Regional Hospital, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Emily Broughton and Monica King
Defendant: Andrew Pearson, City of Hobbs, Patrick Booth, Joshua Urso, Lea Regional Hospital, L.L.C. and John Does
Case Number: 2:2019cv00484
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 9/4/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/5/2019. (gbg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Joshua Urso voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Brennan, Christina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joshua Urso (Brennan, Christina)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant Joshua Urso's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Joshua Urso. (Brennan, Christina)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Joshua Urso of Agreed Upon Extension of Time for Defendant Urso to File an Answer (Brennan, Christina)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Joshua Urso (Agreed Upon Extension for Defendant Urso to File Answer) (Brennan, Christina)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina L Brennan on behalf of Joshua Urso (Brennan, Christina)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James P Sullivan on behalf of Joshua Urso (Sullivan, James)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), City of Hobbs voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Evans, Bryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant City of Hobbs ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Wrongful Death and Constitutional Violations Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. Sec. 1983 by City of Hobbs. (Evans, Bryan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
May 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (khs)
May 24, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6447628 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by City of Hobbs (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Evans, Bryan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Hobbs from Fifth Judicial District, County of Lea, case number D-506-CV-2019-00723. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by City of Hobbs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Def. Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet to Def. Notice of Removal)(Evans, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Lea Regional Hospital, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hobbs
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Represented By: Carla Neusch Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Urso
Represented By: Christina L Brennan
Represented By: James P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lea Regional Hospital, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jacqueline A Olexy
Represented By: Dustin D. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Broughton
Represented By: Elizabeth L Hightower
Represented By: Aaron K. Thompson
Represented By: Alex E Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica King
Represented By: Elizabeth L Hightower
Represented By: Aaron K. Thompson
Represented By: Alex E Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?