Mayo v. Central New Mexico Correctional Facility et al
Plaintiff: Dora Mayo
Defendant: Central New Mexico Correctional Facility and Jesus R Gonzales
Case Number: 2:2019cv00491
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
2 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Central New Mexico Correctional Facility re 14 Notice of Hearing on Motion,,,, of Consent to Telephonic Out-of-District Hearing (Standridge, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support Thereof : Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2019 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. The Court would like to conduct the hearing out of district and by telephone. The purpose of this notice is, in part, to request consent from the parties to allow the Court to conduct the hearing out of district from the Dallas, Texas area. If the parties consent to the Court doing so, they should submit a filing with the Court so stating consent to allow the Court to conduct the hearing out of the district from the Dallas, Texas area. If they do not consent, they should submit a filing so stating and the hearing will be rescheduled. Should counsel also wish to appear telephonically for the hearing they should call the Court's AT&T Conference line at 1-888-684-8852, Access Code: 5469085. (cab)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Central New Mexico Correctional Facility re #6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Central New Mexico Correctional Facility (Standridge, Mark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Show Cause Response due by 6/27/2019. (mm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by June 18, 2019. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (sju)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Show Cause filed by Central New Mexico Correctional Facility. (Standridge, Mark)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Central New Mexico Correctional Facility. (Standridge, Mark)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (mm)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (mm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
May 28, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (ln)
May 28, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces) (Lea County). (ln)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Central New Mexico Correctional Facility re #1 Notice of Removal, of Filing With Thirteenth Judicial District Court (Standridge, Mark)
May 28, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6449002 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Central New Mexico Correctional Facility (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Standridge, Mark)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Central New Mexico Correctional Facility from Thirteenth Judicial District Court, case number D-1314-CV-2019-00038. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Central New Mexico Correctional Facility. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Standridge, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayo v. Central New Mexico Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central New Mexico Correctional Facility
Represented By: Mark D. Jarmie
Represented By: Mark D Standridge
Represented By: Matthew Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus R Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Mayo
Represented By: Tara Wood
Represented By: Tara M Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?