R.G. v. Socorro Consolidated School District
Plaintiff: J. H. and R.G.
Defendant: Socorro Consolidated School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv00543
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for August 8, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (jcm)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Socorro Consolidated School District. (Walz, Jerry)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Socorro Consolidated School District. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by R.G..(Walz, Jerry)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Socorro Consolidated School District Notice of Agreed Upon Extension for Defendant to File Answer (Walz, Jerry)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry A. Walz on behalf of Socorro Consolidated School District (Walz, Jerry)
June 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to Socorro Consolidated School District. (jg)
June 14, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6485142 re #1 Complaint filed by R.G. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hart, Nicholas)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
June 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (khs)
June 13, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (khs)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Socorro Consolidated School District ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by J. H.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hart, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.G. v. Socorro Consolidated School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. H.
Represented By: Nicholas Thomas Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.G.
Represented By: Nicholas Thomas Hart
Represented By: Mark A Earnest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Socorro Consolidated School District
Represented By: Jerry A. Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?