Trejo v. Deming Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Trejo
Defendant: Sophia Cruz, Matt Robinson, Board of Education, Ron Wolfe, Arsenio Romero, Bayne Anderson, Deming Public Schools and William Ruiz
Case Number: 2:2019cv00561
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea VACATING order to show cause and RESCHEDULING telephonic Rule 16 conference. Because Plaintiff has cooperated with Defendants and filed the JSR as provided for in the Court's show-cause order, that order is hereby vacated. Further, the telephonic scheduling conference is hereby reset for August 22, 2019 at 2:00 PM. The parties shall connect to the proceedings by dialing (888) 398-2342 and entering access code 8193818. (cbf)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 27 Joint Status Report by Raymond Trejo (Sherman, Jakub)
August 7, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deming Public Schools to Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Evans, Bryan)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE AND VACATING TELEPHONIC RULE 16 CONFERENCE: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Pursuant the initial scheduling order, the Court ordered the parties to meet and confer on or before July 23, 2019 regarding scheduling and to file their JSR on or before July 30, 2019. To date, however, only Defendants have submitted their portion of the report and have advised the Court that Plaintiff has not made his contributions. Because Plaintiff's participation is essential to a productive Rule 16 hearing, the Court will vacate the scheduling conference set for August 6, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Further, Plaintiff's counsel shall show cause in writing on or before August 12, 2019 why sanctions should not be imposed. In lieu of showing cause, Plaintiff's counsel may work with defense counsel to ensure a complete JSR is filed on or before August 12, 2019. (cbf)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 24 Defendants' Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Deming Public Schools. Related document: #4 Amended Complaint filed by Raymond Trejo.(Evans, Bryan)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for August 6, 2019 at 11:00 AM. Joint Status Report due by July 30, 2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than August 8, 2019. (cbf)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Arsenio Romero voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Evans, Bryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Sophia Cruz voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Evans, Bryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), William Ruiz voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Evans, Bryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Ron Wolfe voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Evans, Bryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Matt Robinson voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Evans, Bryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Bayne Anderson voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Evans, Bryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Board of Education voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Evans, Bryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Deming Public Schools voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Evans, Bryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 Defendants' ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Deming Public Schools.(Evans, Bryan)
July 8, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6528075 re: # 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Raymond Trejo (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sherman, Jakub)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Raymond Trejo by Jakub F Sherman on behalf of: William J. Trejo Leal & Trejo APC 3767 Worsham Ave.Long Beach, CA 90808 (213) 628-0808 Fax (213) 628-0818 wt@leal-law.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sherman, Jakub)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Trejo. William Ruiz served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Sherman, Jakub)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Trejo. Arsenio Romero served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Sherman, Jakub)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Trejo. Ron Wolfe served on 6/22/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Sherman, Jakub)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Trejo. Matt Robinson served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Sherman, Jakub)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Trejo. Bayne Anderson served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Sherman, Jakub)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Trejo. Deming Public Schools served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Sherman, Jakub)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Trejo. Board of Education served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Sherman, Jakub)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Trejo. Sophia Cruz served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Sherman, Jakub)
June 20, 2019 Summons Issued on Amended Complaint as to Bayne Anderson, Board of Education, Sophia Cruz, Deming Public Schools, Matt Robinson, Arsenio Romero, Ron Wolfe. (jg)
June 19, 2019 Summons Issued on Amended Complaint as to William Ruiz. (jg) .
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. adding William Ruiz and William Ruiz., filed by Raymond Trejo. (Sherman, Jakub)
June 18, 2019 Summons Issued as to Bayne Anderson, Board of Education, Sophia Cruz, Deming Public Schools, Matt Robinson, Arsenio Romero, Ron Wolfe. (jg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 18, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jakub F Sherman on behalf of Raymond Trejo (Sherman, Jakub)
June 18, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6489515 re #1 Complaint filed by Raymond Trejo (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sherman, Jakub)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Raymond Trejo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sherman, Jakub)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trejo v. Deming Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophia Cruz
Represented By: Barbara Evans
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Robinson
Represented By: Barbara Evans
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education
Represented By: Barbara Evans
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Wolfe
Represented By: Barbara Evans
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arsenio Romero
Represented By: Barbara Evans
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayne Anderson
Represented By: Barbara Evans
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deming Public Schools
Represented By: Barbara Evans
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ruiz
Represented By: Barbara Evans
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Trejo
Represented By: Jakub F Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?