Swopes v. New Mexico Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Richard Swopes
Defendant: New Mexico Department of Corrections and Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00622
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Martha Vazquez
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Marcus, Lawrence)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Swopes. (gr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Richard Swopes. (mjr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 Letter by Richard Swopes (mjr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Letter by Richard Swopes (mjr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Letter by Richard Swopes. (gr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 Letter by Richard Swopes. (gr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Letter by Richard Swopes. (gr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Letter by Richard Swopes. (gr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by New Mexico Department of Corrections. (Grubel, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James J Grubel on behalf of Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC, New Mexico Department of Corrections (Grubel, James)
July 9, 2019 United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
July 9, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC of Filing State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Stackpole, Matthew)
July 8, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6529213 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stackpole, Matthew)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2018-01831. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Stackpole, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swopes v. New Mexico Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Department of Corrections
Represented By: James J Grubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Stackpole
Represented By: James J Grubel
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Swopes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?