Alonso v. Kalischatarra Iron & Metal NM, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Juan Antonio Alonso
Defendant: Liberty Iron & Metal Inc. and Kalischatarra Iron & Metal NM, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00624
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Juan Antonio Alonso. (Valdez, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Liberty Iron & Metal Inc.. (Noya, Jennifer)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mia Kern Lardy on behalf of Liberty Iron & Metal Inc. (Lardy, Mia)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING #11 the telephonic Oral Argument on [3-1] at 19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The August 21, 2019 telephonic Oral Argument is VACATED. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (jcm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Juan Antonio Alonso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Valdez, John)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Oral Argument on [3-1] at 19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for August 21, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (jcm)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Liberty Iron & Metal Inc., 9 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Kalischatarra Iron & Metal NM, LLC, & 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Juan Antonio Alonso. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (rh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Kalischatarra Iron & Metal NM, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Burns, Clara)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Liberty Iron & Metal Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Noya, Jennifer)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Juan Antonio Alonso voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Valdez, John)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Liberty Iron & Metal Inc. re #5 Reply, Notice of Completion of Briefing on Defendant Liberty Iron & Metal, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss (Noya, Jennifer)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY in Support of Defendant Liberty Iron & Metal, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss - FILED IN STATE COURT ON JUNE 12, 2019 re #3 Transmittal State Court Documents, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Liberty Iron & Metal Inc.. (Noya, Jennifer)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed within 10 days. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Liberty Iron & Metal Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.1, #2 Exhibit 1.2, #3 Exhibit 1.3) (Noya, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 10, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)
July 9, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6532301 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Liberty Iron & Metal Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Noya, Jennifer)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Iron & Metal Inc. from Third Judicial District Court, case number D-307-CV-2019-01393. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Liberty Iron & Metal Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Noya, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alonso v. Kalischatarra Iron & Metal NM, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Antonio Alonso
Represented By: John Paul Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Iron & Metal Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Noya
Represented By: Mia Kern Lardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalischatarra Iron & Metal NM, LLC
Represented By: Clara B Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?