Sperling et al v. Admiral Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Anne Sperling and Lorenza Botello
Defendant: Community Insurance Group SPC, LTD, All World Assurance Company, LTD, Admiral Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Swiss RE International SE, Endurance Specialty Insurance, LTD and Illinois Union Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00721
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Admiral Insurance Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, LTD re #20 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay filed by Admiral Insurance Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, LTD (Shehane, Julie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Defendants Admiral Insurance Company and Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd's Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss and/or Stay filed by Admiral Insurance Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, LTD. (Shehane, Julie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE by Swiss RE International SE Corporate Disclosure Statement (White, Geoffrey)
October 4, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Swiss RE International SE re #19 MOTION to Dismiss or for Stay Pending Appeal of Underlying Judgment filed by Swiss RE International SE (White, Geoffrey)
October 4, 2019 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss or for Stay Pending Appeal of Underlying Judgment filed by Swiss RE International SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (White, Geoffrey)
October 4, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Reply in Support of Steadfast Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss or Stay filed by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Johnson, Wesley)
October 2, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #43 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 Response of Removing Defendants to "Notice of Completing of Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 11 filed by Admiral Insurance Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, LTD, Illinois Union Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company. (Johnson, Wesley)
September 30, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Lorenza Botello, Anne Sperling re #43 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 filed by Lorenza Botello, Anne Sperling (Baker, Douglas)
September 30, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 by Lorenza Botello, Anne Sperling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Baker, Douglas)
September 30, 2019 Filing 42 BRIEF in Support of Illinois Union Motion to Dismiss by Illinois Union Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Biehler, Gregory)
September 26, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Lorenza Botello, Anne Sperling re #13 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum Brief in Support of the Motion filed by Lorenza Botello, Anne Sperling (Baker, Douglas)
September 26, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum Brief in Support of the Motion filed by Lorenza Botello, Anne Sperling. (Baker, Douglas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss or for Stay Pending Appeal of Underlying Judgment Swiss Re International SE filed by Lorenza Botello, Anne Sperling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Baker, Douglas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Admiral Insurance Company and Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd. filed by Lorenza Botello, Anne Sperling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Baker, Douglas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Steadfast Insurance Company filed by Lorenza Botello, Anne Sperling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Baker, Douglas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Application for Writ of Garnishment (Steadfast) by Lorenza Botello, Anne Sperling (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Baker, Douglas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Application for Writ of Garnishment (Endurance) by Lorenza Botello, Anne Sperling (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Baker, Douglas)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag)
September 19, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Biehler, Gregory)
September 18, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6678938 re: # 31 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Biehler, Gregory)
September 18, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by Illinois Union Insurance Company Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company's Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure (Biehler, Gregory)
September 17, 2019 Filing 31 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company by Gregory L. Biehler (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Biehler, Gregory)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endurance Specialty Insurance, LTD identifying Other Affiliate Sompo International Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Sompo Japan Nipponkoa Insurance Inc., Other Affiliate Sompo Holdings, Inc. for Endurance Specialty Insurance, LTD. (Shehane, Julie)
September 13, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Admiral Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Admiral Insurance Company. (Shehane, Julie)
September 13, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Illinois Union Insurance Company Notice of Good Standing of Non-Admitted Counsel (Biehler, Gregory)
September 12, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Illinois Union Insurance Company Substiution of Counsel for Illinois Union Insurance Company (Biehler, Gregory)
September 12, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Swiss RE International SE re #24 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Joinder (White, Geoffrey)
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Steadfast Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd., Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Company, Ltd. for Steadfast Insurance Company. (Johnson, Wesley)
September 12, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum Brief in Support of the Motion filed by Admiral Insurance Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, LTD, Illinois Union Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Johnson, Wesley)
September 6, 2019 Filing 23 BRIEF In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss or Stay by Steadfast Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O) (Johnson, Wesley)
September 6, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Johnson, Wesley)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 BRIEF In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss and/or Stay by Admiral Insurance Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, LTD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit C-1, #6 Exhibit D) (Shehane, Julie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay by Admiral Insurance Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Shehane, Julie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss or for Stay Pending Appeal of Underlying Judgment by Swiss RE International SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (White, Geoffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 10/31/2019. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 11/7/2019 at 03:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (atc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 14. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory L. Biehler on behalf of Illinois Union Insurance Company (Biehler, Gregory)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum Brief in Support of the Motion by Lorenza Botello, Anne Sperling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Baker, Douglas)
August 26, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6630008 re: # 12 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Steadfast Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Brown, Thomas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company by Thomas N. Brown (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Brown, Thomas)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 26, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6629978 re: # 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Steadfast Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Carlson, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company by Michael Carlson (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Carlson, Michael)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 26, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6629922 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Steadfast Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schiller, Ronald)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company by Ronald Schiller (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schiller, Ronald)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Swiss RE International SE re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Agreed Extension to File Responsive Pleading (White, Geoffrey)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey D White on behalf of Swiss RE International SE (White, Geoffrey)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #6 Defendant Community Insurance Group SPC, Ltd.'s Motion for Extension of Time. Community Insurance Group SPC, Ltd. may file a responsive pleading no later than October 14, 2019. (jcm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Community Insurance Group SPC, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Serpe, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Extension of TIme by Admiral Insurance Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, LTD, Illinois Union Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company (Johnson, Wesley)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Superintendent for Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd. Acknowledgement filed by Lorenza Botello, Anne Sperling. (Baker, Douglas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Superintendent for Community Insurance Group SPC, Ltd. Acknowledgement filed by Lorenza Botello, Anne Sperling. (Baker, Douglas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 7, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (jg)
August 7, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
August 7, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6590014 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Admiral Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd., Steadfast Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Johnson, Wesley)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial District Court, County of Santa Fe, State of New Mexico, case number D-101-CV-2019-01747. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Johnson, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sperling et al v. Admiral Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Insurance Group SPC, LTD
Represented By: Wesley Johnson
Represented By: John Serpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All World Assurance Company, LTD
Represented By: Wesley Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admiral Insurance Company
Represented By: Wesley Johnson
Represented By: Julie Shehane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Wesley Johnson
Represented By: Ronald Schiller
Represented By: Michael Carlson
Represented By: Thomas N. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swiss RE International SE
Represented By: Geoffrey D White
Represented By: Alfred A Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance Specialty Insurance, LTD
Represented By: Wesley Johnson
Represented By: Julie Shehane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Wesley Johnson
Represented By: Gregory L. Biehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Sperling
Represented By: Justin D Rodriguez
Represented By: Richard Barrera, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Truett Newell
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Represented By: B. Kent Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenza Botello
Represented By: Justin D Rodriguez
Represented By: Richard Barrera, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Truett Newell
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Represented By: B. Kent Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?