Cruz v. Landrum et al
Plaintiff: Tina Cruz
Defendant: Jameal Landrum, Brandon Roybal and City of Las Cruces
Case Number: 2:2019cv00726
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant City of Las Cruces' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Las Cruces. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Tina Cruz.(Martinez, Damian)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant Landrum and Roybal's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jameal Landrum, Brandon Roybal. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Tina Cruz.(Martinez, Damian)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STAYING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The above-captioned cause is STAYED in all respects pending Defendant Landrum's return from his military deployment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' counsel shall file a notice alerting the Court and Plaintiff's counsel of Defendant Landrum's return as soon as reasonably possible. (gbg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re Applicability of the SCRA to Non-Military Codefendants filed by Jameal Landrum, City of Las Cruces, Brandon Roybal. (Grant, Haley)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held on 9/12/2019 before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt.(gbg)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The Telephonic Status Conference, originally set for 9/12/2019 at 01:30 PM, is hereby RESET to 9/12/2019 at 02:00 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use Code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (gbg)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 01:30 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use Code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mm)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley R. Grant on behalf of All Defendants (Grant, Haley)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Tina Cruz voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Strickland, Margaret)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Jameal Landrum, City of Las Cruces, Brandon Roybal voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Martinez, Damian)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jameal Landrum, City of Las Cruces, Brandon Roybal re #1 Complaint Notice of Agreed Extension to Answer (Martinez, Damian)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Damian L Martinez on behalf of All Defendants (Martinez, Damian)
August 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ln)
August 12, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6597804 re #1 Complaint filed by Tina Cruz (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Strickland, Margaret)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Recovery of Damages Caused by State Torts and By the Deprivation of Civil Rights against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Tina Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strickland, Margaret)
August 8, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Landrum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jameal Landrum
Represented By: Haley R. Grant
Represented By: Damian L Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Roybal
Represented By: Haley R. Grant
Represented By: Damian L Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Cruces
Represented By: Haley R. Grant
Represented By: Damian L Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Cruz
Represented By: Margaret Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?