Ott v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Michael Ott
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00756
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Michael Ott Plaintiff's Notice to Withdraw Discovery to Defendant (Flores, Connie)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Ott. United States of America served on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/04/2019. (Flores, Connie) Modified to correct answer due date on 9/26/2019 (bc).
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Ott (Flores, Connie)
August 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ln)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
August 20, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (ln)
August 19, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6616338 re #1 Complaint filed by Michael Ott (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Flores, Connie)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Michael Ott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, Connie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ott v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ott
Represented By: Connie J. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?