Gaytan v. State of New Mexico et al
Plaintiff: David Gaytan
Defendant: State of New Mexico and A J Romero
Case Number: 2:2019cv00778
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 Joint Status Report by A J Romero, State of New Mexico (Shuter, Marc)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Resetting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. The telephonic scheduling conference currently set for October 24, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby RESET for October 29, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall call (888) 398-2342 and enter access code 8193818 to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (sls)
October 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 10 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by State of New Mexico, A J Romero & 11 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by David Gaytan. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (rh)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Teelphonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for October 24, 2019 at 10:00 AM. Joint Status Report due by October 17, 2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than October 21, 2019. (cbf)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), David Gaytan voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Jaramillo, Amavalise)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), A J Romero, State of New Mexico voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Eaton, Brett)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by A J Romero. (Eaton, Brett)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State of New Mexico. (Eaton, Brett)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett C Eaton on behalf of A J Romero, State of New Mexico (Eaton, Brett)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc T. Shuter on behalf of A J Romero, State of New Mexico (Shuter, Marc)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Nixon on behalf of State of New Mexico (Nixon, Jessica)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number ALB044513 (jg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
August 27, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (ln)
August 27, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces) (Socorro County). (ln)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Coversheet by A J Romero, State of New Mexico (Eaton, Brett)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by A J Romero, State of New Mexico from Seventh Judicial District, Socorro County, case number D-725-CV-2018-00159. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by A J Romero, State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eaton, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaytan v. State of New Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Brett C Eaton
Represented By: Marc T. Shuter
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A J Romero
Represented By: Brett C Eaton
Represented By: Marc T. Shuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gaytan
Represented By: Amavalise F Jaramillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?