HDI Global Specialty SE v. Dynek et al
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE
Defendant: Country Club Estates, LTD., LLC, Harlo Dynek and Summit Building and Development, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00847
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Specialty SE. Summit Building and Development, LLC served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Allen, Meena)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HDI Global Specialty SE. Harlo Dynek served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Allen, Meena)
September 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to Country Club Estates, LTD., LLC, Harlo Dynek, Summit Building and Development, LLC. (arp)
September 13, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6668806 re #1 Complaint, filed by HDI Global Specialty SE (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 12, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Meena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HDI Global Specialty SE v. Dynek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Club Estates, LTD., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harlo Dynek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Building and Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?