Montgomery v. Continental Intermodal Group Trucking LLC
Plaintiff: George Montgomery
Defendant: Continental Intermodal Group Trucking LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00940
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. A Telephonic Rule 16(c) is set for 1/21/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/16/2019. (gbg)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Continental Intermodal Group Trucking LLC (Perez, Monica)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by George Montgomery re Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District Certification of Good Standing for Non-Member Attorneys (Herrmann, Drew)
November 22, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6815972 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by George Montgomery (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Thomson, Matthew)
November 22, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6815948 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by George Montgomery (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lichten, Harold)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff George Montgomery by Matthew Thomson (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Thomson, Matthew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff George Montgomery by Harold L. Lichten (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lichten, Harold)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Continental Intermodal Group Trucking LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by George Montgomery.(Perez, Monica)
November 20, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6809079 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Continental Intermodal Group Trucking LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Perez, Monica)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Continental Intermodal Group Trucking LLC by Monica L. Perez on behalf of: Janet A. Hendrick Phillips Murrah, P.C. 3710 Rawlins Street, Suite 1420Dallas, TX 75201 (214) 615-6391 Fax (214) 434-1370 jahendrick@phillipsmurrah.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Perez, Monica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to Continental Intermodal Group Trucking LLC. (dr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 7, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (dr)
October 7, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)
October 4, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6717446 re #1 Complaint filed by George Montgomery (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Herrmann, Drew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Continental Intermodal Group Trucking LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by George Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herrmann, Drew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. Continental Intermodal Group Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Intermodal Group Trucking LLC
Represented By: Janet A. Hendrick
Represented By: Monica L. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Montgomery
Represented By: Drew N. Herrmann
Represented By: Pamela Herrmann
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Matthew Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?