Bank of the Southwest v. Markham et al
Plaintiff: Bank of the Southwest
Defendant: Voltaire Builders, LLC and Steve Markham
Case Number: 2:2019cv00951
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 On November 26, 2019, the parties submitted a proposed stipulated order of dismissal via email to chambers. Consequently, the Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 1/16/2020 at 03:00 PM is VACATED. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mm)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 1/16/2020 at 03:00 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use Code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by December 27, 2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/13/2019. (mm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 First COUNTERCLAIM and Answer to removed Complaint against All Plaintiffs, filed by Steve Markham, Voltaire Builders, LLC. (Steimel, Walter)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 10, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (dr)
October 10, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)
October 10, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6728885 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Steve Markham, Voltaire Builders, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Steimel, Walter)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Fifth Judicial District Court Chaves County NM, case number D-504-CV-2019-00896. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit All Exhibits)(Steimel, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of the Southwest v. Markham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of the Southwest
Represented By: Jamie M. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voltaire Builders, LLC
Represented By: Walter Earl Steimel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Markham
Represented By: Walter Earl Steimel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?